BILL NUMBER: AB 2729ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 24, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ammiano (Coauthor: Assembly Member Ma) FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add and repeal Section 21455.8 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2729, Ammiano. Vehicles: automated traffic enforcement system: City and County of San Francisco. Existing law authorizes a local authority to place an official traffic control device at an intersection to regulate or prohibit turning movements at that intersection and requires that when a right- or left-hand turn is prohibited at an intersection that notice be given by erection of a sign. Existing law authorizes the limit line, intersection, or other places where a driver is required to stop to be equipped with an automated traffic enforcement system to enforce specified violations, including turning in violation of an official traffic control device, if the system meets certain requirements. Existing law authorizes a governmental agency to contract out the operation of the system under certain circumstances, except for specified activities. This bill would authorize the City and County of San Francisco to utilize an automated traffic enforcement system to enforce a specified traffic offense involving prohibited turning movements from Market Street onto the Central Freeway located at the intersection of Market Street and Octavia Boulevard if the system meets the above-stated requirements. The bill would require the City and County of San Francisco to compile prescribed data, and report to the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing and the Assembly Committee on Transportation on specified topics related to the safety and traffic flow impacts that may have resulted if the above provisions are implemented. This bill would state the findings and declarations of the Legislature concerning the need for special legislation, and would require that these provisions remain in effect only until January 1, 2013. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 21455.8 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 21455.8. (a) The City and County of San Francisco may utilize an automated traffic enforcement system to enforce a violation of subdivision (d) of Section 22101, from Market Street onto the Central Freeway located at the intersection of Market Street and Octavia Boulevard, if the system meets the requirements of Section 21455.5. (b) (1) If the City and County of San Francisco implements an automated traffic enforcement system pursuant to subdivision (a), it shall conduct an evaluation of the system to assess its effectiveness in reducing the number of right-turn violations and collisions between motor vehicles and pedestrians and bicyclists. The evaluation shall include, but is not limited to, all of the following elements: (A) The City and County of San Francisco shall, for not less than 60 days prior to installing the automated traffic enforcement system authorized in subdivision (a), count the total number of right turns that occur from Market Street onto the Central Freeway. The automated traffic enforcement system or other automated equipment may be used during this 60-day period for the sole purpose of counting the number of right-turn violations and collisions that occur, provided no personally identifiable information, including photographs, is collected or stored. (B) Following this 60-day period, the City and County of San Francisco may implement the automated traffic enforcement system provided all of the requirements in Section 21455.5 are met, including installing signage indicating the presence of the system and issuing warning notices for the first 30 days pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 21455.5. (2) The City and County of San Francisco shall report to the Senate Committee on Transportation and Housing and the Assembly Committee on Transportation on the safety and traffic flow impacts that have resulted from the use of the automated traffic enforcement system authorized pursuant to subdivision (a). The report shall include, but is not limited to, all of the following elements: (A) The total number of right-turn violations and collisions between motor vehicles and pedestrians and bicyclists that occur each month from the time the City and County of San Francisco commences the initial 60-day period to December 31, 2012. (B) An analysis of whether any changes in the number of right-turn violations and collisions are statistically significant. (C) A comparison of the number of right-turn violations and collisions that occur at the intersection specified in subdivision (a) and other comparable intersections during this same time period. (D) A description of any other measures that were taken to reduce the number of right-turn violations and collisions from January 1, 2011, to December 31, 2012, inclusive. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2013, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2013, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Due to the unique circumstances concerning traffic enforcement in the City and County of San Francisco, the Legislature finds and declares that a general statute cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution. Therefore, this special statute is necessary and applicable only to the City and County of San Francisco.