California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB33 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/19/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 33AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 19, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 8, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 25, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 23, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 14, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 11, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 24, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 10, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly  Member   Nava   Members   Nava   and Cook  DECEMBER 1, 2008  An act relating to sex offenders.   An act to add Section 13519.07 to the Penal Code, relating to missing persons.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 33, as amended, Nava.  Sex offenders.   Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training: missing children.   Existing law establishes the Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training within the Department of Justice. Under existing law, the commission is required to develop and implement training for peace officers relative to certain areas of criminal law or procedure. Existing law requires the commission to implement a course or courses of instruction for the training of law enforcement officers and law enforcement dispatchers in the handling of missing person and runaway cases and to develop guidelines for law enforcement response to missing person and runaway cases.   This bill would require the commission to develop uniform, minimum guidelines, and to make those available for adoption by California law enforcement agencies, regarding the response to cases of missing children and the reporting of missing children. The bill would require the commission to implement a course or courses of instruction for the training of law enforcement officers regarding cases of missing children and the reporting of missing children.   Existing law generally regulates parole.   This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to strengthen California's parole requirements for sex offenders who are convicted of crimes against a minor.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 13519.07 is added to the   Penal Code   , to read:   13519.07. (a) The Legislature suggests that each law enforcement agency adopt, promulgate, and offer training consistent with an agency's specific policy regarding missing children and the reporting of missing children that, at a minimum, complies with the commission' s guidelines, developed pursuant to this bill, when these guidelines become available. (b) It is the intent of the Legislature that, within two hours of the reported abduction of a child, law enforcement be provided with a list of persons required to register as sex offenders residing within a five-mile radius from the place from which the child was believed to have been abducted. (c) The commission shall develop uniform, minimum guidelines, and make those available for adoption by California law enforcement agencies, regarding the response to cases of missing children and the reporting of missing children. (d) The commission shall implement a course or courses of instruction for the training of law enforcement officers regarding cases of missing children and the reporting of missing children.   SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to strengthen California's parole requirements for sex offenders who are convicted of crimes against a minor.