California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB39 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/02/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 39AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Huffman DECEMBER 1, 2008 An act  to add Division 34 (commencing with Section 84000) to the Water Code,  relating to the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 39, as amended, Huffman. Sacramento-San Joaquin  Delta: Final Delta Vision Strategic Plan.   Delta.  Existing  law requires various state agencies to carry out programs, projects, and activities on behalf of the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta and Suisun Marsh. Existing  law requires the Secretary of the  Natural  Resources Agency to convene a committee to develop and submit to the Governor and the Legislature, on or before December 31, 2008, a Strategic Vision for a Sustainable Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta with specified components. This bill would  declare the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to implement the recommendations in the Final Delta Vision Strategic Plan issued by the Delta Vision Blue Ribbon Task Force and the Delta Vision Committee established pursuant to Executive Order S-17-06 and Chapter 535 of the Statutes of 2006.   require the California Delta and Ecosystem Water Council to prepare a plan to implement the Delta Vision Strategic Plan issued by the Delta Vision Blue Ribbon Task Force in October 2008, and to submit that plan to the Legislature before January 1, 2011.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. AB 39, as amended, Huffman. Sacramento-San Joaquin  Delta: Final Delta Vision Strategic Plan.   Delta.  Existing  law requires various state agencies to carry out programs, projects, and activities on behalf of the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta and Suisun Marsh. Existing  law requires the Secretary of the  Natural  Resources Agency to convene a committee to develop and submit to the Governor and the Legislature, on or before December 31, 2008, a Strategic Vision for a Sustainable Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta with specified components. This bill would  declare the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to implement the recommendations in the Final Delta Vision Strategic Plan issued by the Delta Vision Blue Ribbon Task Force and the Delta Vision Committee established pursuant to Executive Order S-17-06 and Chapter 535 of the Statutes of 2006.   require the California Delta and Ecosystem Water Council to prepare a plan to implement the Delta Vision Strategic Plan issued by the Delta Vision Blue Ribbon Task Force in October 2008, and to submit that plan to the Legislature before January 1, 2011.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Division 34 (commencing with Section 84000) is added to the   Water Code   , to read:   DIVISION 34. Delta Vision CHAPTER 1. GENERAL PROVISIONS 84000. This division shall be known and may be cited as ____. CHAPTER 2. DEFINITIONS 84010. Unless the context otherwise requires, the definitions set forth in this chapter govern the construction of this division. CHAPTER 3. DELTA VISION IMPLEMENTATION 84030. The California Delta and Ecosystem Water Council shall prepare a plan to implement the Delta Vision Strategic Plan issued by the Delta Vision Blue Ribbon Task Force in October 2008, and shall submit that plan to the Legislature before January 1, 2011.   SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to implement the recommendations in the Final Delta Vision Strategic Plan issued by the Delta Vision Blue Ribbon Task Force and the Delta Vision Committee established pursuant to Executive Order S-17-06 and Chapter 535 of the Statutes of 2006.   SECTION 1.   Division 34 (commencing with Section 84000) is added to the   Water Code   , to read:   DIVISION 34. Delta Vision CHAPTER 1. GENERAL PROVISIONS 84000. This division shall be known and may be cited as ____. CHAPTER 2. DEFINITIONS 84010. Unless the context otherwise requires, the definitions set forth in this chapter govern the construction of this division. CHAPTER 3. DELTA VISION IMPLEMENTATION 84030. The California Delta and Ecosystem Water Council shall prepare a plan to implement the Delta Vision Strategic Plan issued by the Delta Vision Blue Ribbon Task Force in October 2008, and shall submit that plan to the Legislature before January 1, 2011.   SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to implement the recommendations in the Final Delta Vision Strategic Plan issued by the Delta Vision Blue Ribbon Task Force and the Delta Vision Committee established pursuant to Executive Order S-17-06 and Chapter 535 of the Statutes of 2006.