BILL NUMBER: AB 429AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 23, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Brownley (Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Huber, Ma, and Torlakson) (Coauthors: Senators Liu and Romero) FEBRUARY 23, 2009 An act to amend Section 52052.5 of add Section 52052.51 to the Education Code, relating to the Public Schools Accountability Act of 1999. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 429, as amended, Brownley. The Public Schools Accountability Act of 1999: advisory committee. Existing law requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to establish an advisory committee to advise on all appropriate matters relative to the creation of the Academic Performance Index and the implementation of the Immediate Intervention/Underperforming Schools Program and the High Achieving/Improving Schools Program. Existing law requires the committee to make recommendations to the Superintendent on the appropriateness and feasibility of a methodology for generating a measurement of academic performance by using unique pupil identifiers and annual academic achievement growth to provide a more accurate measure of a school's academic achievement growth over time. This bill would require the committee, by July 1, 2011, to make recommendations to the Superintendent for the establishment of a methodology for generating a measurement of academic performance using unique pupil identifiers and for developing a longitudinally valid assessment system in which annual academic growth can provide a more accurate and valid measure of a school's academic achievement growth and a pupil's academic achievement growth over time. This bill would require the Superintendent to forward the recommendations by October 1, 2011, to specified entities. This bill would provide that specific provisions of the bill would not be implemented unless and until funds are appropriated by the Legislature in the annual Budget Act or another statute. This bill would state the intent of the Legislature that the advisory committee make recommendations for generating a measurement of academic performance that can provide a more accurate and valid measure of a pupil's academic achievement growth over time and use a specified pilot study in making recommendations, and that the Superintendent forward recommendations containing a cost estimate and timeline for implementation to various state entities. The bill would further state the intent of the Legislature that recommendations to develop a longitudinally valid assessment system not be implemented unless and until funds are specifically appropriated for that purpose. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes no . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 52052.51 is added to the Education Code , to read: 52052.51. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature that the advisory committee established pursuant to Section 52052.5 do both of the following: (1) Make recommendations for generating a measurement of academic performance that can provide a more accurate and valid measure of a pupil's academic achievement growth over time. (2) Use the pilot study of academic growth measures, pursuant to Provision 10 of Item 6110-113-0890 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2007, in making recommendations to the Superintendent for this purpose. (b) If recommendations are made by the advisory committee pursuant to Section 52052.5 and subdivision (a), it is the intent of the Legislature that the Superintendent forward the recommendations of the advisory committee to the state board, the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature, and the Department of Finance. It is further the intent of the Legislature that each recommendation include a cost estimate and a timeline for implementation. (c) No recommendation made pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 52052.5, subdivision (a) of this section, or any other proposal to develop a longitudinally valid assessment system may be implemented unless and until funds are appropriated by the Legislature in the annual Budget Act or another statute enacted specifically for that purpose. SECTION 1. Section 52052.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 52052.5. (a) The Superintendent shall establish a broadly representative and diverse advisory committee to advise the Superintendent and the state board on all appropriate matters relative to the creation of the Academic Performance Index and the implementation of the Immediate Intervention/Underperforming Schools Program and the High Achieving/Improving Schools Program. Members of the advisory committee shall serve without compensation for terms not to exceed two years. The department shall provide staff to the advisory panel. (b) By July 1, 2011, the advisory committee established pursuant to subdivision (a) shall make recommendations to the Superintendent for the establishment of a methodology for generating a measurement of academic performance utilizing unique pupil identifiers for pupils in kindergarten and any of grades 1 to 12, inclusive, and for developing a longitudinally valid assessment system in which annual academic growth can provide a more accurate and valid measure of a school's academic achievement growth and a pupil's academic achievement growth over time. The advisory committee shall use the pilot study of academic growth measures, pursuant to Provision 10 of Item 6110-113-0890 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2007, in making recommendations to the Superintendent for this purpose. By October 1, 2011, the Superintendent shall forward the recommendations of the advisory committee to the state board, the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature, and the Department of Finance. The Superintendent shall include a cost estimate for each recommendation and a timeline for implementation. (c) No recommendation made pursuant to subdivision (b), or any other proposal to develop a longitudinally valid assessment system, may be implemented unless and until funds are appropriated by the Legislature in the annual Budget Act or another statute specifically for that purpose. ____ CORRECTIONS Heading--Amended date. ____