California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB430 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/27/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 430AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hagman (Coauthor: Assembly Member Jeffries) FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to add Section 5056.1 to the Penal Code, relating to corrections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 430, as amended, Hagman. Corrections: citizens' advisory committees. Existing law requires that each state prison under the jurisdiction of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation have a citizens' advisory committee, except that one committee may serve every prison located in the same city or community. Existing law specifies the membership of the committee. This bill would provide that an additional member representing the Chino Valley Independent Fire District would be added to the citizens' advisory committees that advise the California  Institute   Institution  for Men and the California  Institute   Institution  for Women. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5056.1 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 5056.1. (a) The Legislature finds and declares that due to the local conditions resulting in the Chino Valley Independent Fire District having within its area of service two state institutions under the jurisdiction of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, the California  Institute   Institution  for Men and the California  Institute   Institution  for Women, special legislation is needed to address the need for the citizens' advisory committees responsible for those institutions to have an additional member representing the Chino Valley Independent Fire District. (b) In addition to the members designated for the citizens' advisory committees that advise the California  Institute   Institution  for Men and the California  Institute   Institution  for Women pursuant to Section 5056, there shall be an additional member representing the Chino Valley Independent Fire District, nominated by the Chino Valley Independent Fire District, for selection by the warden, pursuant to Section 5056.