California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB46 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/19/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 46AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 19, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Blakeslee DECEMBER 1, 2008 An act to amend  Section 25421 of   Sections 25421 and 25449.4 of, and to add Section 25227 to,  the Public Resources Code, relating to energy, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 46, as amended, Blakeslee. Energy: energy conservation assistance.  Existing   (1)     Existing  law requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission to administer the State Energy Conservation Assistance Account, a continuously appropriated account, in the General Fund, until January 1, 2011, to provide grants and loans to local governments and public institutions to maximize energy use savings. All loans outstanding as of that date are required to continue to be repaid as specified until paid in full, and all unexpended funds in the account on and after that date, except as specified, are required to revert to the General Fund. This bill would extend the operation of those provisions to January 1,  2015   2020  , and would thereby make an appropriation by extending the time during which the funds in a continuously appropriated account are made available.  (2) Existing law establishes, until January 1, 2011, a financial assistance program that provides loans to local jurisdictions for energy projects, including to purchase, maintain, and evaluate energy efficient equipment for existing or new facilities. Existing law establishes, until January 1, 2020, the Local Jurisdiction Energy Assistance Account in the General Fund for the purposes of the program and requires the funds to be disbursed by the Controller as authorized by the commission.   This bill would extend the financial assistance program and the Local Jurisdiction Energy Assistance Account to January 1, 2020.   (3) This bill would authorize the commission to receive and deposit funds from the federal government pursuant to the federal American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 into the State Energy Conservation Assistance Account and the Local Jurisdiction Energy Assistance Account for expenditure as authorized by federal law, and would thereby make an appropriation by authorizing the depositing of moneys into a continuously appropriated account.  Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 25227 is added to the   Public Resources Code   , to read:   25227. The commission may receive and deposit funds from the federal government pursuant to the federal American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 into the State Energy Conservation Assistance Account established pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 25416 and the Local Jurisdiction Energy Assistance Account established pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 25449.3 for expenditure as authorized by federal law.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 25421 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25421. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), this chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2015   2020  , and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, which is enacted before January 1,  2015   2020  , deletes or extends that date. (b) All loans outstanding as of January 1,  2015   2020  , shall continue to be repaid on a semiannual basis, as specified in Section 25415, until paid in full. All unexpended funds in the State Energy Conservation Assistance Account on January 1,  2015   2020  , and thereafter, except to the extent those funds are encumbered pursuant to Section 25417.5, shall revert to the General Fund.  SEC. 3.   Section 25449.4 of the   Public Resources Code   is amended to read:  25449.4. (a) Except as provided in subdivision (b), this chapter shall remain in effect until January 1,  2011   2020  , and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute which is enacted before January 1,  2011  2020  , deletes or extends that date. (b) All loans outstanding as of January 1,  2011   2020  , shall continue to be repaid in accordance with a schedule established by the commission pursuant to Section 25442.7, until paid in full. All unexpended funds in the Local Jurisdiction Energy Assistance Account on January 1,  2011   2020  , and thereafter, except to the extent that those funds are encumbered pursuant to Section 25443.5, shall be deposited in the Federal Trust Fund and be available for the purposes for which federal oil overcharge funds are available pursuant to court judgment or federal agency order.