California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB527 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/27/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 527AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 27, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuentes FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Section 1174.1 to the Labor Code, relating to employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 527, as amended, Fuentes. Employee complaints: proceedings: payroll records. Under existing law, the Labor Commissioner is authorized to investigate employee complaints and to provide a hearing in an action to recover wages, penalties, and other demands for compensation. This bill would provide that if the Labor Commissioner finds that  there is a pattern of falsification of the  payroll records submitted for any pay period relating to any claim or complaint brought pursuant to the commissioner's authority  have been intentionally falsified  , all payroll records relating to that claim or complaint must be presumed false  and disregarded  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1174.1 is added to the Labor Code, to read: 1174.1.  (a)    If the Labor Commissioner finds that  there is a pattern of intentional falsification of the  payroll records submitted for any pay period relating to any claim or complaint brought pursuant to Section 98  have been intentionally falsified  , all payroll records relating to that claim or complaint shall be presumed false  and disregarded  .  (b) For purposes of this section, "a pattern of intentional falsification" means two or more intentionally falsified payroll records.