BILL NUMBER: AB 579ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 11, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Huber FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Section 8546.10 to the Government Code, relating to state boards and commissions, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 579, Huber. State boards and commissions: audits. Under existing law, the Bureau of State Audits has statutory audit and evaluation duties. Existing law specifies that the State Auditor, who is appointed by the Governor, is the head of the Bureau of State Audits. This bill would require the State Auditor to annually, upon appropriation by the Legislature, audit the workload of at least 2 state boards or commissions comprised of board members or commissioners to whom the state pays an annual salary for their service on those state boards and commissions. The State Auditor would be required to make findings for each state board or commission audited regarding the workload of that state board or commission and the number of hours necessary for each board member or commissioner to work to fulfill his or her duties to that state board or commission. The State Auditor would be required to complete these audits and make these findings by December 31 of each year. The State Auditor would also be required to annually report to the Legislature and the Governor regarding these audits and findings. The State Auditor would be required to audit the workload of the California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board in accordance with the above provisions, by December 31, 2010. The bill would appropriate $125,000 from the Unemployment Administration Fund to the Bureau of State Audits for this purpose. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8546.10 is added to the Government Code, to read: 8546.10. (a) Upon appropriation by the Legislature, notwithstanding subdivision (a) of Section 8544.5, the State Auditor shall annually audit the workload of at least two state boards or commissions comprised of board members or commissioners to whom the state pays an annual salary for their service to those state boards and commissions. (b) For each state board or commission audited, the State Auditor shall make findings regarding the workload of that state board or commission and the number of hours necessary for each board member or commissioner to work to fulfill his or her duties to that state board or commission. (c) The State Auditor shall complete the audits required by subdivision (a) and make the findings required by subdivision (b) by December 31 of each year. (d) The State Auditor shall annually report to the Legislature and the Governor regarding the audits and findings required by this section. (e) The State Auditor shall audit, and make findings regarding, the workload of the California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board, in accordance with the requirements of this section, by December 31, 2010. This workload audit shall satisfy one of the annual audits required by subdivision (a) for the year 2010. SEC. 2. The sum of one hundred twenty-five thousand dollars ($125,000) is hereby appropriated from the Unemployment Administration Fund to the Bureau of State Audits for the purposes of conducting the review and issuing the report required pursuant to subdivision (e) of Section 8546.10 of the Government Code.