BILL NUMBER: AB 671ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 9, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 26, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Krekorian (Principal coauthor: Senator Benoit) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Block, Gilmore, Jeffries, Knight, and Torres) (Coauthors: Senators Huff and Wright) FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Chapter 9.9 (commencing with Section 3410) to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to the Golden Shield Award. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 671, Krekorian. Public Safety Golden Shield Award. The Public Safety Officer Medal of Valor Act authorizes the Governor to annually award and present in the name of the State of California a Medal of Valor to one public safety officer, as defined, who is cited by the Attorney General, upon the recommendation of the board, for extraordinary valor above and beyond the call of duty. This bill would require the Governor to additionally annually award and present in the name of the State of California a Golden Shield Award to the next of kin of, or immediate family members of, every public safety officer who, while serving in any capacity under competent authority, has been killed in the line of duty. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 9.9 (commencing with Section 3410) is added to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, to read: CHAPTER 9.9. CALIFORNIA GOLDEN SHIELD ACT 3410. This chapter shall be known and may be cited as the California Golden Shield Act. 3411. The Governor annually shall award, and present in the name of the State of California, a Golden Shield Award of appropriate design, with ribbons and appurtenances, to the next of kin of, or immediate family members of, every public safety officer who, while serving in any capacity under competent authority, has been killed in the line of duty in that year. 3412. For the purposes of this chapter, "public safety officer" means a person serving a public agency, with or without compensation, as a firefighter, law enforcement officer, or emergency services officer. "Law enforcement officer" includes a person who is a corrections or court officer or a civil defense officer.