California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB711 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/07/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 711CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 25 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 7, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JUNE 7, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 26, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 22, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 15, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 5, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 25, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Charles Calderon (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Coto, DeB LaB Torre, DeB Leon, Mendoza, Nava, JohnB A.B Perez, V.B ManuelB Perez, Salas, and Solorio) (Principal coauthors: Senators Calderon, Cedillo, Florez, NegreteB McLeod, and Romero) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act relating to local government, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 711, Charles Calderon. Local agency formation commissions: cost of incorporation proceedings. Existing law, the Cortese-Knox-Hertzberg Local Government Reorganization Act of 2000, authorizes a local agency formation commission to establish a schedule of fees and costs for proceedings taken pursuant to that act, including incorporation proceedings. The act authorizes the local agency formation commission to request a loan from the General Fund to cover the expenses of incorporation proceedings under specified circumstances. This bill would transfer $45,000 from the Environmental Enhancement and Mitigation Program Fund to the General Fund, and appropriate that amount from the General Fund to the Controller for allocation to the Los Angeles County Local Agency Formation Commission for a loan to the East Los Angeles Residents Association, as specified. The bill would make findings and declarations regarding the need for a special statute. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The sum of forty-five thousand dollars ($45,000) is hereby transferred from the Environmental Enhancement and Mitigation Program Fund to the General Fund, and is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Controller for allocation to the Los Angeles County Local Agency Formation Commission for a loan to the East Los Angeles Residents Association, pursuant to subdivision (g) of Section 56383 of the Government Code. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that this act is a special law that is necessary because a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the unique circumstances of the Los Angeles County Local Agency Formation Commission and the East Los Angeles Residents Association. In that respect, the Los Angeles County Local Agency Formation Commission and the East Los Angeles Residents Association require this loan to complete incorporation proceedings. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order for the Los Angeles County Local Agency Formation Commission to grant a loan to the East Los Angeles Residents Association to complete incorporation proceedings and to meet a contractual deadline to pay for and start an economic impact study, it is necessary that this act go into immediate effect.