California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB729 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/22/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 729AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Evans FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to  repeal   amend  Section 20209.14 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 729, as amended, Evans. Public contracts: transit design-build contracts. Existing law authorizes transit operators to enter into a design-build contract, as defined, according to specified procedures.  Existing law requires certain information submitted under these provisions to be submitted under penalty of perjury.  Existing law repeals these provisions on January 1, 2011. This bill would  delete the January 1, 2011, repeal date of these provisions   instead repeal these provisions on January 1, 2015. Because the bill would expand the crime of perjury, it would impose a state-mandated local program  .  The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program:  no   yes  . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 20209.14 of the   Public Contract Code   is amended to read:  20209.14. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2011   2015  , and as of that date is repealed.  SEC. 2.   No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.   SECTION 1.  Section 20209.14 of the Public Contract Code is repealed.