BILL NUMBER: AB 790AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ruskin FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act relating to state scientists. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 790, as amended, Ruskin. State scientists: salaries. Existing law generally requires the Department of Personnel Administration to establish and adjust salary ranges for each class of position in the state civil service subject to any constitutional merit limits. Existing law requires the salary range to be based on the principle that like salaries shall be paid for comparable duties and responsibilities. Existing law prohibits the department from making any adjustments that require expenditures in excess of existing appropriations that may be used for salary increase purposes. This bill woulddeclare the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation toimplement the salary determinations of the Department of Personnel Administration for 14 classifications of state scientist supervisory employees covered by the April 28, 2008, Director's Decision of the Department of Personnel Administration, as ordered by the Sacramento County Superior Court on April 24, 2009. The bill would provide that it is contingent upon an appropriation for that purpose. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:noyes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1.It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to implement theThe salary determinations of the Department of Personnel Administration for 14 classifications of state scientist supervisory employees covered by the April 28, 2008, Director's Decision of the Department of Personnel Administration shall be implemented , as ordered by the Sacramento County Superior Court on April 24, 2009. This act is contingent upon an appropriation for the purpose of this act.