BILL NUMBER: AB 815ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 18, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Caballero FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Section 4 of Chapter 258 of the Statutes of 2003, relating to state property. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 815, Caballero. State property. Existing law authorizes the Director of General Services, with the approval of the Adjutant General, to convey specific property within the City of Salinas, for no less than 50% of fair market value, to the city for development of a police station, under certain conditions. This bill would instead authorize the conveyance for a local government-owned facility under the same conditions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4 of Chapter 258 of the Statutes of 2003 is amended to read: SEC. 4. Notwithstanding any other law, including, but not limited to, Article 1 (commencing with Section 11000) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and Article 8 (commencing with Section 54220) of Chapter 5 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, the Director of General Services, with the approval of the Adjutant General, may convey for no less than 50 percent of fair market value, to the City of Salinas for development of a local government-owned facility, which shall be considered a public benefit, real property located at 100 Howard Street, Salinas, Monterey County on the terms and conditions and subject to the reservations and exceptions that may be in the best interests of the state. The Department of General Services shall be reimbursed for its costs related to the transfer, including, but not limited to, any survey costs, title transfer fees, and department staff time.