California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB818 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/28/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 818AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hernandez FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Section 1279.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 818, as amended, Hernandez. Health facilities: connection ports. Existing law establishes various programs for the prevention of disease and the promotion of the public health under the administration of the State Department of Public Health, including, but not limited to, a program for the licensure and regulation of health facilities. Existing law, to become operative January 1, 2011, prohibits certain health facilities from using an intravenous, epidural, or enteral feeding connection that would fit into a connection port other than the type it was intended for, unless an emergency or urgent situation exists and the prohibition impairs the ability to provide health care. This bill would  delay   , instead, make  the operative date of this prohibition  until   36 months after prescribed standards are developed, or  January 1, 2014  , whichever occurs first.   The bill would require the Advanced Medical Technology Association to report annually to the Legislature on the progress of the development of those standards  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1279.7 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 1279.7. (a) A health facility, as defined in subdivision (a), (b), (c), or (f) of Section 1250, shall implement a facility-wide hand hygiene program. (b)  Beginning January 1, 2014,   Commencing 36 months after the publication of a new design standard for connections for intravenous, epidural, or enteral applications by the International Organization for Standardization, or January 1, 2014, whichever occurs first,  a health facility, as defined in subdivision (a), (b), (c), or (f) of Section 1250, is prohibited from using an intravenous connection, epidural connection, or enteral feeding connection that would fit into a connection port other than the type it was intended for, unless an emergency or urgent situation exists and the prohibition impairs the ability to provide health care.  (c) The Advanced Medical Technology Association shall, on January 1 of each year until the standards are developed, provide the Legislature with a report on the progress of the International Organization for Standardization in developing new design standards for connections for intravenous, epidural, or enteral applications.