California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB909 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/16/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 909AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hill FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Sections 21453 and 42001.15 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 909, as amended, Hill. Vehicles: right turn violations. Existing law requires a driver facing a steady circular red signal alone to stop at a marked limit line, but if none, before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection or, if none, then before entering the intersection, and to remain stopped until an indication to proceed is shown, except as specified. A violation of this provision is an infraction punishable by a fine of $100.  Existing law also authorizes, except when a sign is in place prohibiting a turn, a driver, facing a steady circular red signal who has stopped as required pursuant to the above provisions, to turn right or turn left from a one-way onto a one-way street provided the driver yields the right-of-way, as specified.  This bill would instead require that a  violation of this provision for a right turn violation   failure to comply with this provision when making a turn  is punishable by a fine  of $35   not exceeding $100  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 21453 of the   Vehicle Code   is amended to read:  21453. (a) A driver facing a steady circular red signal alone shall stop at a marked limit line, but if none, before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection or, if none, then before entering the intersection, and  shall remain stopped   may not proceed straight through the intersection or turn left  until an indication to proceed is shown, except as provided in subdivision (b). (b) Except when a sign is in place prohibiting a turn, a driver, after stopping as required by subdivision (a), facing a steady circular red signal, may turn right, or turn left from a one-way street onto a one-way street. A driver making that turn shall yield the right-of-way to pedestrians lawfully within an adjacent crosswalk and to any vehicle that has approached or is approaching so closely as to constitute an immediate hazard to the driver, and shall continue to yield the right-of-way to that vehicle until the driver can proceed with reasonable safety. (c) A driver facing a steady red arrow signal shall not enter the intersection to make the movement indicated by the arrow and, unless entering the intersection to make a movement permitted by another signal, shall stop at a clearly marked limit line, but if none, before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection, or if none, then before entering the intersection, and shall remain stopped until an indication permitting movement is shown. (d) Unless otherwise directed by a pedestrian control signal as provided in Section 21456, a pedestrian facing a steady circular red or red arrow signal shall not enter the roadway.  SEC. 2.   Section 42001.15 of the   Vehicle Code   is amended to read:  42001.15.  (a)    Every person convicted of an infraction for a violation of subdivision (a) or (e) of Section 21453, subdivision (c) of Section 21454, or subdivision (a) of Section 21457 shall be punished by a fine of one hundred dollars ($100).  (b) Every person convicted of an infraction for a failure to comply with subdivision (b) of Section 21453 when making a turn shall be punished by a fine not exceeding one hundred dollars($100).   SECTION 1.   Section 21453 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 21453. (a) (1) A driver facing a steady circular red signal alone shall stop at a marked limit line, but if none, then before entering the intersection, and shall remain stopped until an indication to proceed is shown, except as provided in subdivision (b). (2) A driver facing a steady circular red signal alone shall stop at a marked limit line, but if none, then before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection, and shall remain stopped until an indication to proceed is shown, except as provided in subdivision (b). (b) (1) Except when a sign is in place prohibiting a turn, a driver, after stopping as required by subdivision (a), facing a steady circular red signal, may do either of the following: (A) Turn right. (B) Turn left from a one-way street onto a one-way street. (2) A driver making the turn in subparagraph (A) or (B) shall yield the right-of-way to pedestrians lawfully within an adjacent crosswalk and to any vehicle that has approached or is approaching so closely as to constitute an immediate hazard to the driver, and shall continue to yield the right-of-way to that vehicle until the driver can proceed with reasonable safety. (c) A driver facing a steady red arrow signal shall not enter the intersection to make the movement indicated by the arrow and, unless entering the intersection to make a movement permitted by another signal, shall stop at a clearly marked limit line, but if none, before entering the crosswalk on the near side of the intersection, or if none, then before entering the intersection, and shall remain stopped until an indication permitting movement is shown. (d) Unless otherwise directed by a pedestrian control signal as provided in Section 21456, a pedestrian facing a steady circular red or red arrow signal shall not enter the roadway.   SEC. 2.   Section 42001.15 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 42001.15. (a) Every person convicted of an infraction for a violation of paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) or subdivision (c) of Section 21453, subdivision (c) of Section 21454, or subdivision (a) of Section 21457 shall be punished by a fine of one hundred dollars ($100). (b) Every person convicted of an infraction for a violation of paragraph (2) of subdivision (a) of Section 21453 for right turn violations shall be punished by a fine of thirty-five dollars ($35).