California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB921 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/17/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 921AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 26, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Jones (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Beall, and Portantino) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to add Section 607.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to children. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 921, as amended, Jones. Juvenile court jurisdiction: services and benefits. Existing law provides that a minor may be adjudged a dependent child or a ward of the juvenile court under specified circumstances. Existing law authorizes the court to place a minor who has been removed from the custody of his or her parent or guardian in foster care among other placements, as specified. Existing law provides for the termination of the juvenile court  jurisdiction  when the minor reaches a specified age. This bill would require  a probation officer or parole officer, whenever  the juvenile court  , whenever it orders a hearing to terminate, on the basis of age, the jurisdiction of the court   terminates jurisdiction  over a ward  who was previously adjudged a dependent child of the juvenile court, to order the probation officer   , or upon release of a ward from a nonfoster care facility,  to provide to the  ward   person  a written notice stating that the person is a former foster child and  is   may be  eligible for the services and benefits that are available to a former foster child through public and private programs, and  to provide to the ward all necessary  information  regarding  that informs the person of  the availability of, and assistance to enable the ward to apply for and gain acceptance into, federal and state programs that provide independent living services and benefits to former foster children for which the person is or may be eligible. By imposing additional duties upon probation officers, this bill would create a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 607.5 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 607.5.  (a)    Notwithstanding any other provision of law, whenever  the juvenile court orders a hearing to terminate, on the basis of age, the jurisdiction of the court, over a ward who was previously adjudged a dependent child of the court pursuant to Section 300, the court shall order the probation officer to provide to the ward both of the following:   the juvenile court terminates jurisdiction over a ward, or upon release of a ward from a nonfoster care facility, a probation officer or parole officer shall provide the person with everything   identified in subdivisions (b) and (c). This section shall apply to any ward who was previously adjudged a dependent child of the court pursuant to Section 300 or a child who at any time has been placed in foster care pursuant to Section 727.   (a)   (b)  A written notice stating that the person is a former foster child and  is   may be  eligible for the services and benefits that are available to a former foster child through public and private programs, including, but not limited to, any independent living program for former foster children.  (b) All necessary information regarding   (c)     Information that informs the person of  the availability of, and assistance to enable the person to apply for and gain acceptance into, federal and state programs that provide independent living services and benefits to former foster children, including, but not limited to, financial assistance, housing, and educational resources, for which he or she is or may be eligible. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.