California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB967 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/16/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 967AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 7, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Ma and Lieu  (   Coauthor:   Senator   Hancock   )  FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Section 400 of the Family Code, relating to marriage. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 967, as amended, Ma. Marriages. Existing law provides that a marriage may be solemnized by authorized persons of any religious denomination, by specified legislators, constitutional officers, and California Members of Congress, while those persons are currently holding that office, and by specified justices, judges, and magistrates, both current and retired. This bill would authorize  a   an elected  mayor of a  chartered  city, while that person holds that office, to solemnize a marriage ceremony. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 400 of the Family Code is amended to read: 400. Marriage may be solemnized by any of the following who is  of the age of  18 years  of age  or older: (a) A priest, minister, rabbi, or authorized person of any religious denomination. (b) A judge or retired judge, commissioner of civil marriages or retired commissioner of civil marriages, commissioner or retired commissioner, or assistant commissioner of a court of record in this state. (c) A judge or magistrate who has resigned from office. (d) Any of the following judges or magistrates of the United States: (1) A justice or retired justice of the United States Supreme Court. (2) A judge or retired judge of a court of appeals, a district court, or a court created by an act of Congress the judges of which are entitled to hold office during good behavior. (3) A judge or retired judge of a bankruptcy court or a tax court. (4) A United States magistrate or retired magistrate. (e) A legislator or constitutional officer of this state or a Member of Congress who represents a district within this state, while that person holds office.  (f) A mayor of a city, while that person holds office.   (f) A mayor of a chartered city elected in accordance with Article 3 (commencing with Section 34900) of Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 4 of the Government Code, while that person holds office.