BILL NUMBER: ACR 107CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 85 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 17, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 11, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torres JANUARY 25, 2010 Relative to National Night Out. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 107, Torres. National Night Out. This measure would proclaim August 3, 2010, as National Night Out in California, and would urge the people of California to observe and participate in National Night Out. WHEREAS, On August 3, 2010, the National Association of Town Watch and Target are sponsoring the 27th Annual National Night Out, a unique, nationwide crime, drug, and violence prevention program; and WHEREAS, National Night Out is a night for America to stand together to promote police-community partnerships, neighborhood safety and unity, and awareness and cooperation; and WHEREAS, National Night Out is designed to heighten crime and drug prevention awareness; generate support for, and participation in, local anticrime efforts; strengthen neighborhood spirit and police-community partnerships; and send a message to criminals letting them know neighborhoods are organized and fighting back; and WHEREAS, From 7:00 to 10:00 p.m. on August 3, 2010, residents in neighborhoods throughout California and across the nation are asked to lock their doors, turn on outside lights, and spend the evening outside with neighbors and police; and WHEREAS, Many neighborhoods throughout California and across the nation will be hosting a variety of special events on August 3, 2010, such as block parties, cookouts, parades, visits from police, flashlight walks, contests, youth activities, and anticrime rallies; and WHEREAS, National Night Out has proven to be an effective, inexpensive, and enjoyable program to promote neighborhood spirit and police-community partnerships in our fight for a safer nation, and provides community benefits that extend well beyond the night; and WHEREAS, Over 36 million people participated in National Night Out in 2009, including citizens, law enforcement agencies, civic groups, businesses, neighborhood organizations, and local officials from over 15,000 communities from all 50 states, United States territories, Canadian cities, and military bases worldwide; and WHEREAS, National Night Out provides a unique opportunity for California to recognize the thousands of communities across the state and country promoting cooperative, police-community crime prevention efforts; and WHEREAS, It is essential that all people of California be aware of the importance of crime prevention programs and the impact that their participation can have on reducing crime, drugs, and violence; and WHEREAS, All people should be encouraged to join with their local police and sheriff's departments, the National Association of Town Watch, and Target in supporting the 27th Annual National Night Out; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims August 3, 2010, as National Night Out in California, and urges the people of California to observe and participate in National Night Out; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.