California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR107 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/11/2010

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 107AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 11, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torres  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Adams,   Ammiano,   Anderson,   Arambula,   Bass,   Beall,   Bill Berryhill,   Tom Berryhill,   Blakeslee,   Block,   Blumenfield,   Bradford,   Brownley,   Buchanan,   Charles Calderon,   Carter,   Chesbro,   Cook,   Coto,   Davis,   De La Torre,   De Leon,   DeVore,   Emmerson,   Eng,   Feuer,   Fletcher,   Fong,   Fuentes,   Fuller,   Furutani,   Gaines,   Galgiani,   Garrick,   Gilmore,   Hagman,   Hayashi,   Hernandez,   Hill,   Huber,   Huffman,   Jeffries,   Jones,   Lieu,   Logue,   Bonnie Lowenthal,   Ma,   Mendoza,   Miller,   Monning,   Nava,   Nestande,   Nielsen,   John A. Perez,   V. Manuel Perez,   Portantino,   Ruskin,   Salas,   Saldana,   Silva,   Skinner,   Smyth,   Solorio,   Audra Strickland,   Swanson,   Torlakson,   Torrico,   Tran,   and Yamada   )  JANUARY 25, 2010 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 107, as amended, Torres. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. This measure memorializes the week beginning April 11, 2010, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, Over one-half million dedicated men and women are engaged in the operation of emergency response systems for federal, state, and local governmental entities throughout the United States; and WHEREAS, An estimated 55,000 dedicated men and women are engaged in answering 911 calls and operating the emergency response systems in California; and WHEREAS, These individuals are responsible for responding to the telephone calls of the general public for police, fire, and emergency medical assistance, and for dispatching this critical assistance necessary to help save the lives and property of our citizens; and WHEREAS, Emergency calls include not only police, fire, and emergency medical service calls, but those of governmental communications related to forestry and conservation operations, highway safety and maintenance activities, and all of the other operations which an effective governmental agency must conduct; and WHEREAS, Public safety telecommunicators are the first point of contact for most interactions between members of the public and the public safety systems that keep Californians safe, and the public expects and receives extraordinarily dedicated service from these individuals; and WHEREAS, America's public safety telecommunicators serve the public in countless ways each day, often without recognition by the beneficiaries of their services; and WHEREAS, Congress has designated the week of April 11 to April 17, 2010, as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the week beginning April 11, 2010, is designated as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and the Governor is requested to issue a proclamation calling on the people of the State of California to observe the week with appropriate ceremonies and activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.