BILL NUMBER: ACR 107AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 11, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torres ( Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Ammiano, Anderson, Arambula, Bass, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Tom Berryhill, Blakeslee, Block, Blumenfield, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Charles Calderon, Carter, Chesbro, Cook, Coto, Davis, De La Torre, De Leon, DeVore, Emmerson, Eng, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuentes, Fuller, Furutani, Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gilmore, Hagman, Hayashi, Hernandez, Hill, Huber, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Lieu, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mendoza, Miller, Monning, Nava, Nestande, Nielsen, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Ruskin, Salas, Saldana, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Torlakson, Torrico, Tran, and Yamada ) JANUARY 25, 2010 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. National Night Out. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 107, as amended, Torres. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. National Night Out. This measure memorializes the week beginning April 11, 2010, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week would proclaim August 3, 2010, as National Night Out in California, and would urge the people of California to observe and participate in National Night Out . Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, On August 3, 2010, the National Association of Town Watch and Target are sponsoring the 27th Annual National Night Out, a unique, nationwide crime, drug, and violence prevention program; and WHEREAS, National Night Out is a night for America to stand together to promote police-community partnerships, neighborhood safety and unity, and awareness and cooperation; and WHEREAS, National Night Out is designed to heighten crime and drug prevention awareness; generate support for, and participation in, local anticrime efforts; strengthen neighborhood spirit and police-community partnerships; and send a message to criminals letting them know neighborhoods are organized and fighting back; and WHEREAS, From 7:00 to 10:00 p.m. on August 3, 2010, residents in neighborhoods throughout California and across the nation are asked to lock their doors, turn on outside lights, and spend the evening outside with neighbors and police; and WHEREAS, Many neighborhoods throughout California and across the nation will be hosting a variety of special events on August 3, 2010, such as block parties, cookouts, parades, visits from police, flashlight walks, contests, youth activities, and anticrime rallies; and WHEREAS, National Night Out has proven to be an effective, inexpensive, and enjoyable program to promote neighborhood spirit and police-community partnerships in our fight for a safer nation, and provides community benefits that extend well beyond the night; and WHEREAS, Over 36 million people participated in National Night Out in 2009, including citizens, law enforcement agencies, civic groups, businesses, neighborhood organizations, and local officials from over 15,000 communities from all 50 states, United States territories, Canadian cities, and military bases worldwide; and WHEREAS, National Night Out provides a unique opportunity for California to recognize the thousands of communities across the state and country promoting cooperative, police-community crime prevention efforts; and WHEREAS, It is essential that all people of California be aware of the importance of crime prevention programs and the impact that their participation can have on reducing crime, drugs, and violence; and WHEREAS, All people should be encouraged to join with their local police and sheriff's departments, the National Association of Town Watch, and Target in supporting the 27th Annual National Night Out; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims August 3, 2010, as National Night Out in California, and urges the people of California to observe and participate in National Night Out; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. WHEREAS, Over one-half million dedicated men and women are engaged in the operation of emergency response systems for federal, state, and local governmental entities throughout the United States; and WHEREAS, An estimated 55,000 dedicated men and women are engaged in answering 911 calls and operating the emergency response systems in California; and WHEREAS, These individuals are responsible for responding to the telephone calls of the general public for police, fire, and emergency medical assistance, and for dispatching this critical assistance necessary to help save the lives and property of our citizens; and WHEREAS, Emergency calls include not only police, fire, and emergency medical service calls, but those of governmental communications related to forestry and conservation operations, highway safety and maintenance activities, and all of the other operations which an effective governmental agency must conduct; and WHEREAS, Public safety telecommunicators are the first point of contact for most interactions between members of the public and the public safety systems that keep Californians safe, and the public expects and receives extraordinarily dedicated service from these individuals; and WHEREAS, America's public safety telecommunicators serve the public in countless ways each day, often without recognition by the beneficiaries of their services; and WHEREAS, Congress has designated the week of April 11 to April 17, 2010, as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the week beginning April 11, 2010, is designated as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and the Governor is requested to issue a proclamation calling on the people of the State of California to observe the week with appropriate ceremonies and activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.