BILL NUMBER: ACR 109CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 31 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 2, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JUNE 2, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 18, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nestande (Principal coauthor: Senator Ducheny) JANUARY 26, 2010 Relative to the Roy Wilson Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 109, Nestande. Roy Wilson Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 74 in the City of Palm Desert and Riverside County as the Roy Wilson Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Supervisor Roy Wilson was best known for his role as Riverside County Supervisor for the 4th District, where his commitment to serving his community greatly advanced the quality of life in Coachella Valley until his death in 2009; and WHEREAS, Roy Wilson was known to his constituents, colleagues, neighbors, and friends as an exceptional leader and a selfless, dedicated public servant in the Coachella Valley; and WHEREAS, Roy Wilson was also a strong advocate for conservation of the scenic lands along State Highway Route 74, including the Santa Rosa and San Jacinto Mountains National Monument; and WHEREAS, Roy Wilson was involved in ongoing efforts to protect the scenic beauty and improve the safety of State Highway Route 74 as well as promote involvement of the communities along State Highway Route 74 in its betterment; and WHEREAS, As Riverside County Supervisor for the 4th District, Roy Wilson was also instrumental in the successful effort to prepare and implement the Coachella Valley Multiple Species Habitat Conservation Plan/Natural Community Conservation Plan, which will result in the establishment of a comprehensive and coherent Multiple Species Reserve System including lands along State Highway Route 74 in the Santa Rosa and San Jacinto Mountains; and WHEREAS, Roy Wilson also served on the governing board of the South Coast Air Quality Management District for 22 years; and WHEREAS, It is therefore appropriate to designate a portion of State Highway Route 74 in recognition of the numerous achievements and contributions of Roy Wilson; now, therefore, be it, Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 74 beginning at the entrance to the Santa Rosa and San Jacinto Mountains National Monument visitor center and extending four miles to the west thereof, in the City of Palm Desert and Riverside County, as the Roy Wilson Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.