BILL NUMBER: ACR 124ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 12, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bass FEBRUARY 16, 2010 Relative to the Culver City Police Lieutenant Curtis Massey Memorial Overpass. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 124, Bass. Culver City Police Lieutenant Curtis Massey Memorial Overpass. This measure would designate the eastbound portion of a specified overpass on the Interstate 10 Freeway in the City of Los Angeles as the Culver City Police Lieutenant Curtis Massey Memorial Overpass. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, January 28, 2010, marks the first anniversary of the tragic death of Lieutenant Curtis Massey of the Culver City Police Department; and WHEREAS, On that date in 2009, Lieutenant Massey was killed when his unmarked vehicle was struck head-on by a vehicle driven the wrong way on the Interstate 10 Freeway near National Boulevard in the City of Los Angeles; and WHEREAS, Lieutenant Massey faithfully served the people of California, and we take this opportunity to look back on his accomplishments and to pay special tribute to his bravery and dedication; and WHEREAS, Lieutenant Massey was born on June 1, 1967, the son of Stephen Massey and Padric Davis of Pacific Palisades. Lieutenant Massey was born at Santa Monica Hospital, as were his grandmother, mother, and brother; and WHEREAS, Lieutenant Massey attended Saint Matthews School and Palisades High School, graduating as part of the class of 1985. In those early years, Lieutenant Massey was a role model to many and was instrumental in the lives of young children through his job as a summer camp counselor at St. Matthews Day Camp; and WHEREAS, Lieutenant Massey furthered his education at Northern Arizona University where he received his bachelor's degree. In addition to his collegiate work, Lieutenant Massey devoted himself, again, to helping others as part of the Flagstaff EMT unit; and WHEREAS, That devotion to helping others led Lieutenant Massey to a career in law enforcement. Accordingly, Lieutenant Massey graduated from the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Academy in 1992; and WHEREAS, Not long thereafter, Lieutenant Massey met his wife Melody, and they married in 1994 and soon after started a family; and WHEREAS, Lieutenant Massey devoted his life to his family and the public, particularly at-risk youths; and WHEREAS, Beginning as a patrol officer, Lieutenant Massey served with distinction during his 17-year career in a variety of assignments within the Culver City Police Department; most notably with the juvenile section of the detective bureau, specifically the juvenile diversion program; and WHEREAS, During that time, Lieutenant Massey's admirable drive to protect and serve the public, and his dedication to duty, led Lieutenant Massey to be honored as "Officer of the Year" three times within the Culver City Police Department. Lieutenant Massey was also a recipient of the "Medal of Valor," the department's highest honor. Lieutenant Massey had recently been assigned as the supervisor of the juvenile section of the detective bureau, and spent a lot of his own free time working with at-risk children; and WHEREAS, Besides his service to the public, Lieutenant Massey was instrumental in the lives of his own family members, and enjoyed his role as a devoted father and husband; and WHEREAS, Lieutenant Massey would frequent the local ice cream store with his children in arm, volunteered to carpool children to and from school when his shift would allow, and enjoyed coaching his son's sports teams; and WHEREAS, Lieutenant Massey is lovingly remembered by his family and is survived by his wife, Melody, and his three young children; and WHEREAS, For all these reasons, and many more, it is appropriate to recognize Lieutenant Massey and his devoted work and commitment as a law enforcement officer; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the eastbound portion of the National Boulevard overpass on the Interstate 10 Freeway in the City of Los Angeles is hereby designated as the Culver City Police Lieutenant Curtis Massey Memorial Overpass; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.