California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR137 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/17/2010

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 137CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 90 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 17, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 12, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 22, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Carter (Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Ammiano, Arambula, Bass, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Tom Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Caballero, Charles Calderon, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Coto, Davis, De La Torre, De Leon, DeVore, Emmerson, Eng, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuentes, Fuller, Furutani, Gaines, Galgiani, Gilmore, Hagman, Hayashi, Hernandez, Hill, Huber, Huffman, Jones, Lieu, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mendoza, Miller, Monning, Nava, Nestande, Nielsen, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Ruskin, Salas, Saldana, Skinner, Solorio, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Torres, Torrico, Tran, Villines, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 19, 2010 Relative to Latino Education and Advocacy Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 137, Carter. Latino Education and Advocacy Week. This measure would declare the last week of March every year as a statewide week of advocacy for Latino education. WHEREAS, The strength of the California education system and its place in a competitive global economy will depend largely on future educational outcomes among Latino students; and WHEREAS, Latinos emerged as the largest minority group in the United States in the new millennium; and WHEREAS, Statistically, since 1998, Latino children have become the largest minority student demographic in United States public schools; and WHEREAS, Both Latino students and teachers have a high mobility rate, are located in racially segregated communities with high poverty rates, and attend schools with fewer resources, staffing, and programs; and WHEREAS, Latino students have among the highest dropout rate, score among the lowest on achievement tests, and have low college enrollment rates; and WHEREAS, One-half of all Latino students currently fail to graduate high school, and have had little progress in increasing college graduation rates over the last few decades; and WHEREAS, Latino students represent an opportunity to increase diversity, strengthen the tax, labor, consumption, and investment pool, and increase ties with Mexico and Latin America; and WHEREAS, Beginning March 29, 2010, California State University, San Bernardino, College of Education will host its inaugural Latino Education and Advocacy Week summit; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That every year the last week of March is hereby declared as a statewide week of advocacy for Latino education; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.