California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR31 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/09/2010

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 31CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 140 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 24, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 12, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 1, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 21, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Ruskin and Block (Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Ammiano, Anderson, Arambula, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Tom Berryhill, Blakeslee, Blumenfield, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Caballero, Carter, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Coto, De Leon, DeVore, Emmerson, Eng, Evans, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuentes, Fuller, Furutani, Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gilmore, Hagman, Hall, Harkey, Hayashi, Hernandez, Hill, Huber, Huffman, Jones, Knight, Lieu, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Mendoza, Miller, Monning, Nava, Nestande, Niello, Nielsen, John A. Perez, V. Manuel Perez, Portantino, Salas, Saldana, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Audra Strickland, Swanson, Torlakson, Tran, Villines, and Yamada) (Coauthors: Senators Aanestad, Alquist, Ashburn, Calderon, Cedillo, Cogdill, Corbett, Correa, Denham, DeSaulnier, Ducheny, Dutton, Florez, Hancock, Harman, Hollingsworth, Huff, Kehoe, Leno, Liu, Lowenthal, Negrete McLeod, Oropeza, Padilla, Pavley, Price, Romero, Runner, Simitian, Steinberg, Strickland, Walters, Wiggins, Wolk, Wright, Wyland, and Yee) FEBRUARY 23, 2009 Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 31, Ruskin. California Holocaust Memorial Week. This measure would proclaim April 12 through April 18, 2010, as California Holocaust Memorial Week and would urge Californians to observe these days of remembrance for the victims of the Holocaust in an appropriate manner. WHEREAS, The Holocaust was a tragedy of proportions the world had never before witnessed; and WHEREAS, More than 60 years have passed since the tragic events we now call the Holocaust transpired, in which the dictatorship of Nazi Germany murdered six million Jews, as part of a systematic program of genocide known as "The Final Solution of the Jewish Question"; and WHEREAS, Jews were the primary victims, but they were not alone. Five million other people were murdered in Nazi concentration camps as part of a carefully orchestrated, state-sponsored program of cultural, social, and political annihilation under the Nazi tyranny; and WHEREAS, We must recognize the heroism of those who provided assistance to the victims of the Nazi regime, including the many soldiers who liberated concentration camps and provided comfort to those suffering; and WHEREAS, We must teach our children, and future generations, that the individual and communal acts of heroism during the Holocaust serve as a powerful example of how our nation and its citizens can, and must, respond to acts of hatred and inhumanity; and WHEREAS, We must always remind ourselves of the horrible events of the Holocaust and remain vigilant against hatred, persecution, and tyranny lest these atrocities be repeated; and WHEREAS, We, the people of California, should actively rededicate ourselves to the principles of human rights, individual freedom, and equal protection under the laws of a just and democratic society; and WHEREAS, Each person in California should set aside moments of his or her time every year to give remembrance to those who lost their lives in the Holocaust; and WHEREAS, The United States Holocaust Memorial Council has designated April 11 through April 18, 2010, as the Days of Remembrance of the Victims of the Holocaust, including the International Day of Remembrance, known as Yom HaShoah, on April 11, 2010; and WHEREAS, According to Elie Wiesel, a Holocaust survivor, Nobel Laureate, and internationally recognized scholar, "... a memorial unresponsive to the future would violate the memory of the past"; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That April 12 through April 18, 2010, be proclaimed "California Holocaust Memorial Week," and that Californians are urged to observe these days of remembrance for victims of the Holocaust in an appropriate manner; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit sufficient copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.