California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR33 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/20/2009

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 33AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Jeffries  (   Coauthor:   Senator   Hollingsworth   )  FEBRUARY 24, 2009 Relative to the Deputy Kent Hintergardt Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 33, as amended, Jeffries. Deputy Kent Hintergardt Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified  location on   portion of  State Highway Route 15 in Temecula as the Deputy Kent Hintergardt Memorial Highway.  This   The  measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering those costs, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Deputy Kent Alan Hintergardt, born in Whittier on December 14, 1959, had a childhood dream to serve as a deputy sheriff; and WHEREAS, Deputy Hintergardt graduated from California High School in Whittier, and earned an Associates Degree in Police Science from Rio Hondo College; and WHEREAS, Deputy Hintergardt worked as an Assistant Manager for Vons grocery store for 10 years prior to joining the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department on March 22, 1989, and graduated from the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Academy on August 31, 1989; and WHEREAS, Deputy Hintergardt's first assignment was in the Los Angeles County Central Jail until he joined the Riverside County Sheriff's Department on February 7, 1991, and was assigned to the Lake Elsinore Station; and WHEREAS, Deputy Hintergardt was reassigned to the Southwest Station and eventually was assigned to the City of Temecula, where he served the last few months before his untimely death; and WHEREAS, Deputy Hintergardt, at the age of 33  years  , was shot and killed in the line of duty on Mother's Day, May 9, 1993, in Temecula  ,  when he responded to a domestic violence call; and WHEREAS, Deputy Hintergardt is survived by his wife Linda, daughter Marissa, and daughter Kena, who was born seven months after her father's death, and his father Farrell, his mother Pat, his brother Mark, his sisters Terrie and Sandie, and many friends, each of whom will always remember him as a wonderful, loving, family man and friend; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Deputy Hintergardt's contributions and sacrifice in serving and protecting the residents of Los Angeles County and Riverside County, it would be a fitting tribute to designate a portion of State Highway Route 15, in Temecula, as the Deputy Kent Hintergardt Memorial Highway; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the 4.3 mile portion of State Highway Route 15 from the State Highway Route 215 interchange to the South 79 Exit at State Highway Route 79 in Temecula as the Deputy Kent Hintergardt Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.