California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR9 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/25/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AJR 9CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 57 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 25, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 22, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 10, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member John A. Perez (Principal coauthor: Senator Leno) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Arambula, Beall, Block, Blumenfield, Brownley, Buchanan, Chesbro, Coto, De Leon, Eng, Feuer, Fong, Fuentes, Furutani, Galgiani, Hall, Hernandez, Hill, Huber, Huffman, Jones, Lieu, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Monning, Nava, Portantino, Price, Ruskin, Salas, Saldana, Skinner, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Yamada, Adams, Anderson, Bass, Bill Berryhill, Tom Berryhill, Blakeslee, Caballero, Carter, Conway, Cook, Davis, De La Torre, DeVore, Duvall, Emmerson, Evans, Fletcher, Gilmore, Hagman, Harkey, Hayashi, Jeffries, Knight, Krekorian, Logue, Mendoza, Miller, Nestande, Nielsen, V. Manuel Perez, Silva, Audra Strickland, Torlakson, Torrico, Tran, and Villines) (Coauthors: Senators Alquist, DeSaulnier, Kehoe, Liu, Pavley, Wright, and Yee) FEBRUARY 26, 2009 Relative to the Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AJR 9, John A. Perez. Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006. This measure would urge the Congress and President of the United States to enact legislation that would provide for a 3-year extension of the Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006, including the existing formula-based funding for states with maturing names-based HIV reporting systems, from its current sunset on September 30, 2009, to September 30, 2012. WHEREAS, Acquired Immunodeficiency Syndrome (AIDS) is a life-threatening, incurable disease that has caused an estimated 25 million deaths worldwide; and WHEREAS, As of November 1, 2008, the State Department of Public Health reported that approximately 151,921 individuals have been diagnosed with AIDS in California since 1983, of whom 66,014 are living with AIDS, while more than 170,000 Californians are estimated to be living with the human immunodeficiency virus (HIV), the virus that causes AIDS; and WHEREAS, Pursuant to Section 131019 of the Health and Safety Code, the Office of AIDS, within the State Department of Public Health, has lead responsibility for coordinating state programs, services, and activities relating to HIV and AIDS; and WHEREAS, The mission of the Office of AIDS is to assess, prevent, and interrupt the transmission of HIV and provide for the needs of infected Californians by identifying the scope and extent of HIV infection, disseminating timely and complete information, ensuring high-quality preventive, early intervention, and care services that are appropriate, accessible, and cost effective, to promote the effective use of available resources, and to provide leadership through a collaborative process of policy and program development, implementation, and evaluation; and WHEREAS, The State of California, through its Office of AIDS, and in collaboration with county and local governments and private health care providers, has developed a complex and interdependent system of HIV/AIDS care and treatment that relies on federal financial participation through the Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006, Public Law 109-415, to assist the state in meeting the growing health care and social service needs of the people living with HIV disease, including life-saving antiretroviral medications, primary health care, hospice care, home health, supportive services, and substance abuse counseling; and WHEREAS, The State of California, together with county and local governments and private health care providers within the state, received direct funding in excess of three hundred twenty million dollars ($320,000,000) through the Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006 in the 2007-08 fiscal year; and WHEREAS, The Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006 sunsets on September 30, 2009; and WHEREAS, The Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006 requires the use of names-based HIV data to determine the allocation of formula funding to states and Part A jurisdictions, but currently includes exceptions to the names-based HIV data requirement for states with immature HIV data systems; and WHEREAS, California did not institute a names-based system of HIV data until April 17, 2006, and currently does not have a fully mature names-based data system; and WHEREAS, Without the protections that exist in the Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006 for states, like California, that do not have fully matured names-based HIV data systems, California would likely suffer a substantial reduction in formula funding that would devastate established treatment, care, and support systems throughout the state; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly and the Senate of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature urges the Congress and President of the United States to enact legislation that would provide for a three-year extension of the Ryan White HIV/AIDS Treatment Modernization Act of 2006, including the existing formula-based funding for states with maturing names-based HIV reporting systems, from its current sunset on September 30, 2009, to September 30, 2012. This extension will protect funding for California through the act, preserve existing systems of treatment, care, and other vital services for people living with HIV/AIDS, and ensure that California and other states have sufficient time to mature their names-based HIV case reporting systems; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States.