BILL NUMBER: SB 1057CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 511 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 3, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 12, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 10, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 3, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Denham (Coauthors: Senators Cox, Maldonado, and Wiggins) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Adams, Davis, DeVore, Gilmore, Knight, and Nielsen) FEBRUARY 16, 2010 An act to amend Section 6703 of the Government Code, relating to state holidays. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1057, Denham. State holidays: Veterans Day: state office closure. Existing law recognizes various holidays, including November 11, known as Veterans Day. Existing law requires that public offices of the state and state institutions, except for the University of California, be closed on Veterans Day. This bill would require that public offices of the state and state institutions, including, but not limited to, all state agencies and the Legislature, be closed on November 11 for Veterans Day, except as specified. The bill would also state the Legislature's intent that the University of California also be closed on November 11, Veterans Day. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6703 of the Government Code is amended to read: 6703. (a) Public offices of the state, state institutions, and the University of California shall be closed on Admission Day. (b) Public offices of the state and state institutions, including, but not limited to, all state agencies and the Legislature, shall be closed on November 11, Veterans Day. If, in a given year, November 11 falls on a Saturday, then public offices of the state and state institutions, including the Legislature, shall be closed on Friday, November 10. If, in a given year, November 11 falls on a Sunday, then public offices of the state and state institutions, including the Legislature, shall be closed on Monday, November 12. It is the intent of the Legislature that the University of California also be closed on the Veterans Day holiday.