California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1196 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/01/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1196AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 1, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator  Negrete McLeod   DeSaulnier  FEBRUARY 18, 2010  An act to add Section 4474.9 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.   An act to amend Section 1596.656 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to child care.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1196, as amended,  Negrete McLeod   DeSaulnier  .  Lanterman Developmental Center.   Child Care.   Existing law requires the State Department of Social Services to establish a trustline registry for trustline providers who met prescribed requirements.   Existing law defines trustline provider as a person 18 years of age or older who provides child care, supervision, or any person providing in-home educational or counseling services to a minor, and who is not required to be licensed as a child day care provider.   Existing law, commencing January 1, 2011, provides that a person who provides care or supervision in an ancillary day care center, as defined, shall be registered as a trustline provider, and specifically defines trustline provider as also meaning a person who provides care or child care supervision in an ancillary day care center, other than the parent, or guardian of the child receiving the care.   This bill would, instead, provide that, commencing January 1, 2011, a person 18 years of age or over who provides care or supervision in an ancillary day care center, shall be registered as a trustline provider. It would specifically provide that nothing in the trustline provider provisions shall be construed to prevent a person under 18 years of age from being employed in an ancillary day care center.   Existing law vests the State Department of Developmental Services with jurisdiction over specified state developmental centers, including the Lanterman Developmental Center, to be used as a developmental center for the provision of services to people with developmental disabilities. Existing law specifies the procedure that the department is required to use in the closure of a developmental center.   This bill would require plans and other public documents, and notice of public meetings or teleconferences, relative to the proposed closure of the Lanterman Developmental Center, to be posted on the department's Internet Web site, as specified.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION. 1.   Section 1596.656 of the   Health and Safety Code   is amended to read:  1596.656. (a) A person  18 years of age or older,  who provides child care or child care supervision in an ancillary day care center, as defined in Section 1596.60, shall be registered pursuant to Sections 1596.603 and 1596.605.  Nothing in this chapter shall be construed to prevent a person under 18 years of age from being employed in an ancillary day care center.  (b) This section shall become operative on January 1, 2011.  SECTION 1.   Section 4474.9 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 4474.9. The State Department of Developmental Services shall maximize opportunities for public involvement relative to the proposed closure of the Lanterman Developmental Center by requiring that any plans and other public documents be posted on the department' s Internet Web site no more than 72 hours after publication. In addition, the department shall post on its Internet Web site notice of any public meetings or teleconferences relative to the proposed closure of the Lanterman Developmental Center, along with public access information, no less than 72 hours prior to those public meetings or teleconferences.