California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1198 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/30/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1198AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 27, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 12, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff (Coauthors: Senators Cogdill, Denham, Dutton, Harman, Hollingsworth, and Runner) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Gilmore, Jeffries, Knight, Silva, and Smyth) FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend Section 25213 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1198, as amended, Huff. Energy: State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission: regulations. The Warren-Alquist State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Act requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission to adopt those regulations that are necessary to carry out the act. The act also requires the commission, after one or more public hearings, to prescribe, by regulation, standards for minimum levels of operating efficiency and prescribe other measures, such as energy and water consumption labeling not preempted by federal labeling law, to promote the use of energy and water efficient appliances that do not result in any added total costs for consumers over the designed life of the appliances concerned. This bill would provide that the television product labeling regulations adopted by the commission would not be effective until July 1, 2011, and  would be effective on that date only  if  the   a  United States Federal Trade Commission  fails to issue a final  labeling rule for those products  as of   is not effective on or before  July 1, 2011. The bill  further provides   also would provide  that those regulations would remain in effect only until  the   a  Federal Trade Commission  issues a final  labeling rule for television products  becomes effective  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25213 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25213. (a) The commission shall adopt rules and regulations, as necessary, to carry out the provisions of this division in conformity with the provisions of Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code. The commission shall make available to a person upon request copies of proposed regulations, together with summaries of reasons supporting their adoption. (b) (1) Notwithstanding any other law, the television product labeling regulations adopted by the commission shall not take effect, and the commission shall not enforce those regulations, before July 1, 2011. (2) On and after July 1, 2011, the television product labeling regulations shall be effective if  the   a  Federal Trade Commission  fails to issue a final  labeling rule for television products  is not effective on or  before July 1, 2011, and shall remain in effect until  the   a  Federal Trade Commission  issues a  final labeling rule  is effective  for television products.