California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1290 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/28/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1290AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 14, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 23, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Saldana   )  FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 51223.3 to the Education Code, relating to physical education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1290, as amended, Kehoe. Physical education: self-defense and safety instruction. Existing law requires that all pupils in grades 7 to 12, inclusive, except those excused or exempted pursuant to a prescribed provisions of law, attend physical education courses for a total period of time of not less than 400 minutes each 10 schooldays. Pursuant to its authority to issue program guidelines to serve as models or examples, the State Board of Education has adopted physical education model content standards for California public schools. This bill  , commencing with the 2011-12 school year,  would require the State Board of Education to include self-defense instruction, as defined, and safety instruction, as defined, in the  next revision of the  physical education  model content standards   framework for pupils in grades 7, 8, 9, 11, and 12  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51223.3 is added to the Education Code, to read:  51223.3. (a) Commencing with the 2011-12 school year, the State Board of Education shall include self-defense instruction and safety instruction in the physical education model content standards for pupils in grades 7 to 12, inclusive. Self-defense training shall be incorporated into grade 9 or high school physical education course 1 standards.   51223.3.   (a) During the next revision of the physical education framework, the state board shall include self-defense instruction and safety instruction in that framework for pupils in grades 7, 8, 9, 11, and 12.  (b) As used in this section: (1) "Safety instruction" includes, but is not necessarily limited to, awareness and avoidance of potentially dangerous situations. (2) "Self-defense instruction" includes, but is not necessarily limited to, martial arts, boxing, and other defensive techniques.