California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1303 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/19/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1303AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 19, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wolk FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 2087 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to protected species. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1303, as amended, Wolk. Protected species: accidental take: agricultural activities. The California Endangered Species Act, until January 1, 2011, exempts from its provisions the accidental take of candidate, threatened, or endangered species resulting from acts that occur on a farm or a ranch in the course of otherwise lawful routine and ongoing agricultural activities. This bill would  delete   extend  that repeal date  , thereby making that exemption operative indefinitely   to January 1, 2012  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2087 of the Fish and Game Code is amended to read: 2087.  (a)    Accidental take of candidate, threatened, or endangered species resulting from acts that occur on a farm or a ranch in the course of otherwise lawful routine and ongoing agricultural activities is not prohibited by this chapter.  (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2012, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2012, deletes or extends that date.