California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1328 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/12/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1328AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 12, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 25, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lowenthal FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 43018.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1328, as amended, Lowenthal. Greenhouse gas emissions:  automotive glazing standards.   motor vehicle cabin temperature.  The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The state board is required to adopt a statewide greenhouse gas emissions limit equivalent to the statewide greenhouse gas emissions level in 1990 to be achieved by 2020, and to adopt rules and regulations in an open public process to achieve the maximum technologically feasible and cost-effective greenhouse gas emission reductions. This bill would require the  executive officer of the board, by no later than January 1, 2011, to complete and approve alternative test procedures for automotive glazing standards applicable to new passenger cars, light duty trucks, and medium duty vehicles less than or equal to 10,000 pounds gross vehicle weight (GVW) in order to reduce the percentage of the total solar energy (Tts) transmitted into the vehicle when the vehicle is parked   state board to consider specified matters in developing regulations to reduce motor vehicle cabin temperature in order to reduce greenhouse gas emissions . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 43018.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 43018.7.  No later than January 1, 2011, the executive officer of the board shall complete and approve the alternative test procedures for automotive glazing standards referenced in Section 95603 of Title 17 of the California Code of Regulations.   In developing regulations to reduce motor vehicle cabin temperature in order to reduce greenhouse gas emissions, the state board shall consider all of the following:   (a) Potential reductions in air conditioning use that can be achieved while a motor vehicle is moving, in addition to reductions in air conditioning use when a motor vehicle is parked.   (b) Potential conflicts between, and relative benefits of, motor vehicle cabin temperature reduction requirements and technologies that provide motor vehicle greenhouse gas emission reductions through various means.   (c) The manufacturing flexibility necessary to achieve overall maximum greenhouse gas emission reductions from motor vehicles.