California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1365 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1365AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 12, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Corbett FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend  Sections 108555, 108565, 108570, and 108575   Section 108555  of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public safety. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1365, as amended, Corbett. Public safety: consumer products. Existing law provides no person shall manufacture, sell, or exchange, have in his or her possession with intent to sell or exchange, or expose or offer for sale or exchange to any retailer, any toy that is contaminated with any toxic substance, as provided, including, but not limited to, paints and lacquers containing compounds of lead in excess of that permitted by federal law, as specified.  Existing law provides for enforcement of these provisions by the State Department of Public Health and local health officers.  This bill would  also allow the Department of Toxic Substances Control to enforce these provisions. This bill would provide that when a penalty is imposed by any of the enforcement agencies, as provided, the other 2 may not also impose a penalty for the same incidence of violation. The bill would also  revise the cross-reference to federal law. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  yes   no  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 108555 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 108555. (a) No person shall manufacture, sell, or exchange, have in his or her possession with intent to sell or exchange, or expose or offer for sale or exchange to any retailer, any toy that is contaminated with any toxic substance or that is any of the following: (1) Is coated with paints and lacquers containing compounds of lead of which the lead content (calculated as Pb) is in excess of that permitted by federal regulations contained in Part 1303 of Title 16 of the Code of Federal Regulations adopted pursuant to the Consumer Product Safety Act (Title 15 (commencing with Section 2051) of the United States  Code   Code)  and the lead limit as reduced by Congress in Section 101(f) of the Consumer Product Safety Improvement Act of 2008 (Public Law 110-314), or soluble compounds of antimony, arsenic, cadmium, chromium, mercury, selenium, or barium, as identified in  the  ASTM International Standard F963-08 "Standard Consumer Safety Specification for Toy Safety" (ASTM F963). (2) Consists in whole or in part of a diseased, contaminated, filthy, putrid, or decomposed substance. (3) Has been produced, prepared, packed, shipped, or held under unsanitary or other conditions whereby it may have become contaminated with filth or hazardous materials or otherwise rendered injurious to health. (4) Is stuffed, padded, or lined with materials that are toxic or that would otherwise be hazardous if ingested, inhaled, or contacted. (5) Is a stuffed, padded, or lined toy that is not securely wrapped or packaged. (b) The department  , the Department of Toxic Substances Control,  and local health officers shall enforce this article. (c) Violation of this section is a misdemeanor punishable by a fine not exceeding one thousand dollars ($1,000) for each violation or by imprisonment in the county jail for a period not exceeding one year, or both.  (d) If a penalty is imposed pursuant to this section by the State Department of Public Health, a local health officer, or the Department of Toxic Substances Control, then a penalty shall not be imposed by either of the other two enforcement entities for the same incidence of violation.   SEC. 2.   Section 108565 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 108565. (a) Whenever a duly authorized representative of the department, the Department of Toxic Substances Control, or a local health officer finds, or has probable cause to believe, that any toy is or would be in violation of this article, he or she shall affix to the toy or a component thereof a tag or other appropriate marking, and shall give notice that the toy is suspected of being in violation of this article, that the toy has been embargoed, and that no person shall remove the toy until permission for removal or disposal is given by an authorized agent of the department, the Department of Toxic Substances Control, the local health officer, or the court. (b) A local health officer or the Department of Toxic Substances Control shall notify the department within 48 hours of any action taken pursuant to subdivision (a).   SEC. 3.   Section 108570 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 108570. No person shall knowingly remove, sell, or dispose of a detained or embargoed toy without permission of an authorized agent of the department, the Department of Toxic Substances Control, the local health officer, or the court. Violation of this section is a misdemeanor punishable by a fine not exceeding one thousand dollars ($1,000) for each violation or by imprisonment in the county jail for a period not exceeding one year, or both.   SEC. 4.   Section 108575 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 108575. When an authorized agent of the department, the Department of Toxic Substances Control, or the local health officer finds, or has reasonable cause to believe, that an embargo will be violated, he or she may remove the embargoed toy to a place of safekeeping.