California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1380 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/22/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1380AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 22, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 15, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 17078.73 to the Education Code, relating to school facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1380, as amended, Hancock. School facilities: construction. Existing law establishes the Career Technical Education Facilities Program as a part of the Leroy F. Greene School Facilities Act of 1998 for the purpose of providing funding to qualifying local educational agencies for constructing new facilities or reconfiguring existing facilities, including purchasing equipment with an average useful life expectancy of at least 10 years, to enhance educational opportunities for pupils in existing high schools. This bill would require school facilities constructed or modernized with specified bond funds set aside for career technical education purposes to be used for career technical education purposes for a minimum of  25   10  years.  A   The governing board of an applicant  school district would be required to  adopt a resoluti   on   stating the intent to use those facilities for career technical education purposes and  provide certification regarding that use  to the Office of Public School Construction  during the first year of occupation  and every 5 years thereafter  .  The bill would authorize the governing board of a school district to seek a waiver of the   career technical education use r   e   quirement   from the State Allocation Board if the facility or educational program of the school district changes during the initial 10 years of use.  The bill would  require   encourage  school districts applying for a career technical education grant to include teachers of career technical education and members of the local career technical education advisory committee in the design and planning process. The bill would authorize up to  10%   25%  of the funds provided for equipment to be used for the purchase of items or equipment with a life expectancy of at least 5 years.  The bill would require the School Facilities Planning Division of the State Department of Education to review the reservation of funds aspect of the program, make recommendations to facilitate timely use of state bond funds, and submit the findings and recommendations to the State Allocation Board by December 31, 2011.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 17078.73 is added to the Education Code, to read: 17078.73. (a) School facilities constructed or modernized using funds received pursuant to paragraph (4) of subdivision (a) of Section 101012 shall be used for career technical education purposes for a minimum of  25   10  years.  A school district   The governing board of an applicant school district shall submit a resolution adopted by the governing board stating the intent to use the facilities built or modernized with funds   received pursuant to paragraph (4) of subdivision (a) of Section 101012 for career technical education purposes and  shall provide certification regarding this use during the first year of occupation of the school facility  and every five years thereafter.   . If the facility or educational program of the school district changes during the initial 10 years of use, the governing board may seek a waiver of the career technical education use requirement from the board.  (b) A school district applying for a career technical education grant  shall   is encouraged to  include teachers of career technical education and members of the local career technical education advisory committee in the design and planning process leading to the submission of an application that is a request for full funding or a reservation of funds. (c) Qualifying equipment purchased with funds received pursuant to paragraph (4) of subdivision (a) of Section 101012 shall have a life expectancy of at least 10 years, except that up to  10   25  percent of the funds provided for equipment may be used for the purchase of items or equipment with a life expectancy of at least five years.  (d) The School Facilities Planning Division of the State Department of Education shall review the reservation of funds aspect of the program established pursuant to this article and shall identify the number of applications submitted as requests for a reservation of funds that have resulted in completed projects, the length of time between when the reservation of funds is made and space is occupied or equipment is purchased. The School Facilities Planning Division of the State Department of Education shall make recommendations to facilitate timely use of state bond funds. Findings and recommendations shall be submitted to the board by December 31, 2011.