BILL NUMBER: SB 1381INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Simitian FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 48005.55 of the Education Code, relating to the Kindergarten Readiness Pilot Program. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1381, as introduced, Simitian. Kindergarten Readiness Pilot Program. Existing law establishes the Kindergarten Readiness Pilot Program, to be implemented in the 2006-07 school year and requires a participating school district to offer admission to 1st grade at the beginning of the school year, or at a later time in the same school year, only to children who will have their 6th birthday on or before September 1 of that school year. Under existing law, these provisions become inoperative on July 1, 2013, and are repealed as of January 1, 2014. This bill would delete the July 1, 2013, inoperative date and the January 1, 2014, repeal date of those provisions and would instead provide that the provisions become inoperative on July 1, 2015, and be repealed as of January 1, 2016. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 48005.55 of the Education Code is amended to read: 48005.55. This article shall become inoperative on July 1,20132015 , and, as of January 1,20142016 , is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1,20142016 , deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.