BILL NUMBER: SB 1386AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Veterans Affairs ( Denham (Chair), Cedillo, Correa, Maldonado, Negrete McLeod, Wiggins, and Wyland) FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 705 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the Department of Veterans Affairs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1386, as amended, Committee on Veterans Affairs. Department of Veterans Affairs: inventory of resources. Under existing law, the Department of Veterans Affairs has specified powers and duties relating to veterans. This bill would require the department, byan unspecified dateJanuary 1, 2012 , to conduct an inventory of existing military resources , as described, in California, in order to facilitate the department's efforts to maximize available federal funding to provide services and support for veterans, and by June 30, 2012, to submit a report to the Legislature concerning the results of the inventory. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 705 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read: 705. (a)On or before ____,(1) On or before January 1, 2012, the Department of Veterans Affairs shall conduct an inventory of existing military resources in California, including military bases and personnel, in order to facilitate the department's efforts to maximize available federal funding to provide services and support for veterans. The Department of Veterans Affairs shall consult with the Military Department in connection with the conduct of the inventory required pursuant to this subdivision. (2) For purposes of this section, "military resources" includes, but is not limited to, all of the following: (A) Federal active and reserve component military units and installations, which currently are operational, and unclassified descriptions of their potential to support the goals of this inventory. (B) State active and reserve component military units and installations, which currently are operational, and unclassified descriptions of their potential to support the goals of this inventory. (C) Military installations previously closed pursuant to a base closure and realignment process, and their potential to support the goals of this inventory. (D) Federal government veterans resources, including, but not limited to, veterans homes, hospitals, clinics, post-traumatic stress syndrome and other counseling services, and employment assistance. (E) State government veterans resources, including, but not limited to, veterans homes, hospitals, clinics, post-traumatic stress syndrome and other counseling services, and employment assistance. (F) Other resources, as may be designated by the Legislature.(b) The Department of Veterans Affairs shall, on or before ____,(b) (1) The Department of Veterans Affairs shall, on or before June 30, 2012, submit a report to the Legislature concerning the results of the inventory specified in subdivision (a). (2) The requirement for submitting a report imposed under this subdivision is inoperative on June 30, 2016, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code. (3) A report to be submitted pursuant to this subdivision shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.