California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1437 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/13/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1437AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 740.2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1437, as amended, Kehoe. Electricity: plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles. Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission  (CPUC)   (PUC)  has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical corporations. Existing law requires the  CPUC   PUC  , in consultation with the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, the State Air Resources Board, electrical corporations, and the motor vehicle industry, to evaluate policies to develop infrastructure sufficient to overcome any barriers to the widespread deployment and use of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles and, by July 1, 2011, to adopt rules that address specified  matter   matters  . This bill would require the  CPUC   PUC, by July 1, 2012,  to determine, for each class of ratepayers,  the portion of the billings that are used for subsidizing electricity for plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles   the direct costs and benefits associated with the expected additional load from plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 740.2 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 740.2. (a) The commission, in consultation with the Energy Commission,  the  State Air Resources Board, electrical corporations, and the motor vehicle industry, shall evaluate policies to develop infrastructure sufficient to overcome any barriers to the widespread deployment and use of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles. By July 1, 2011, the commission shall adopt rules to address all of the following: (1) The impacts upon electrical infrastructure, including infrastructure upgrades necessary for widespread use of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles and the role and development of public charging infrastructure. (2) The impact of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles on grid stability and the integration of renewable energy resources. (3) The technological advances that are needed to ensure the widespread use of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles and what role the state should take to support the development of this technology. (4) The existing code and permit requirements that will impact the widespread use of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles and any recommended changes to existing legal impediments to the widespread use of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles. (5) The role the state should take to ensure that technologies employed in plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles work in a harmonious manner and across service territories. (6) The impact of widespread use of plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles on achieving the state's goals pursuant to the California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 and renewables portfolio standard program and what steps should be taken to address possibly shifting emissions reductions responsibilities from the transportation sector to the electrical industry. (b)  The   By July 1, 2012, the  commission, for each class of ratepayers, shall  determine the portion of the billings that are used for subsidizing electricity for plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles. This determination shall identify those costs for electrical infrastructure improvements that are borne by each class of ratepayers that are incurred in order to accommodate plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles.   determine the direct costs and benefits associated with the expected additional load from plug-in hybrid and electric vehicles. This determination shall include the direct costs of fueling plug-in hybrid and   electric vehicles, including the costs of charging connections and upgrades to utility service and the distribution system, and the direct benefits provided, including the increased utilization of existing grid infrastructure.