BILL NUMBER: SB 1473AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 12, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 25, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wyland FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to add Section 15281 15286 to the Education Code, relating to school facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1473, as amended, Wyland. School facilities bond proceeds: performance audits. The California Constitution limits the maximum amount of any ad valorem tax on real property to 1% of the full cash value of the property. The California Constitution states that the 1% limitation for ad valorem taxes does not apply to ad valorem taxes or assessments to pay the interest and redemption charges on bonded indebtedness incurred by a school district, community college district, or county office of education for the construction, reconstruction, rehabilitation, or replacement of school facilities approved by 55% of the voters if the proposition includes specified accountability requirements. The accountability requirements include a requirement that the governing board of either the school district or community college district or the county office of education conduct an annual, independent performance audit to ensure that the funds are expended only on the specific projects listed in the proposition authorizing the sale of the bonds. This bill would require a financial and performance audit to be conducted in accordance with the Government Auditing Standards issued by the Comptroller General of the United States. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 15286 is added to the Education Code , to read: 15286. The annual, independent financial and performance audits required by subparagraphs (C) and (D) of paragraph (3) of subdivision (b) of Section 1 of Article XIII A of the California Constitution shall be conducted in accordance with the Government Auditing Standards issued by the Comptroller General of the United States for financial and performance audits, to the extent required by Article XIII A of the California Constitution. SECTION 1. Section 15281 is added to the Education Code, to read: 15281. The annual, independent performance audit required by subparagraph (C) of paragraph (3) of subdivision (b) of Section 1 of Article XIII A of the California Constitution shall be conducted in accordance with the Government Auditing Standards issued by the Comptroller General of the United States for performance audits.