California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1483 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/27/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1483CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 339 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 27, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 19, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 3, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wright MARCH 8, 2010 An act to amend Section 36710 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to multifamily improvement districts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1483, Wright. Multifamily improvement districts. Existing law establishes the Multifamily Improvement District Law to provide, until January 1, 2012, for the establishment of multifamily improvement districts within a city or county to levy assessments on residential rental properties within the district for the purpose of financing certain improvements and promoting certain activities beneficial to those properties. This bill would extend these provisions until January 1, 2022. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 36710 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 36710. (a) A multifamily improvement district may be established pursuant to this chapter. (b) A city may not form a multifamily improvement district on or after January 1, 2022, unless a later statute which is enacted on or before January 1, 2022, deletes or extends that date.