California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB285 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/01/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 285AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 1, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 22, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wright FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to add Section 483.013 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to attachment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 285, as amended, Wright. Disability benefits: attachment. Existing law prescribes the procedures to obtain a writ of attachment and to determine the amount that may be attached. Existing federal law prohibits payments or benefits due to a disabled veteran, as specified, from being assigned or liable to attachment, levy, or seizure by or under any legal or equitable process. This bill would provide that benefits awarded to veterans for service-connected disabilities, as provided, shall be exempt from the claim of creditors, and shall not be liable to attachment, levy, or seizure, as provided. This bill would declare the intent of the Legislature to conform to existing federal law. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation to conform to existing federal law  that prohibits   , which provides that  payments or benefits due to a veteran  , with   for  a service-connected disability  , from being assigned or   shall be exempt fro   m creditor   claims, and shall not be  liable to attachment, levy, or seizure by or under any legal or equitable process. SEC. 2. Section 483.013 is added to the Code of Civil Procedure, to read: 483.013. Notwithstanding Section 483.010, federal disability benefits awarded to veterans for service-connected disabilities pursuant to Chapter 11 of Title 38 of the United States Code shall be exempt from the claim of creditors, and shall not be liable to attachment, levy, or seizure by or under any legal or equitable  process whatever, either before or after receipt by the beneficiary.   process whatsoever, as provided by federal law.