California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB289 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/24/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 289INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Ducheny FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to amend Section 130061 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 289, as introduced, Ducheny. Hospitals: seismic safety: periodic reports. Existing law, the Alfred E. Alquist Hospital Facilities Seismic Safety Act of 1983, establishes, under the jurisdiction of the Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, a program of seismic safety building standards for certain hospitals constructed on and after March 7, 1973. Existing law authorizes the office to assess an application fee for the review of facilities design and construction, and requires that full and complete plans be submitted to the office for review and approval. Existing law requires that, after January 1, 2008, any general acute care hospital building that is determined to be a potential risk of collapse or pose significant loss of life be used only for nonacute care hospital purposes, except that the office may grant an extension under prescribed circumstances. Under existing law, if an extension is granted, the hospital owner is required to submit periodic reports on compliance. This bill would additionally require, for the report due to the office no later than June 30, 2011, that the report include, for building or buildings to be removed from acute care service, the inpatient and outpatient services delivered in the building or buildings and the number of patient visits for each of those services in the years 2008, 2009, and 2010. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 130061 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 130061. (a) An owner of a general acute care hospital building that is classified as a nonconforming Structural Performance Category-1 (SPC-1) building, who has not requested an extension of the deadline described in subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 130060, shall submit a report to the office no later than April 15, 2007, describing the status of each building in complying with the requirements of Section 130060. The report shall identify at least all of the following: (1) Each building that is subject to subdivision (a) of Section 130060. (2) The project number or numbers for retrofit or replacement of each building. (3) The projected construction start date or dates and projected construction completion date or dates. (4) The building or buildings to be removed from acute care service and the projected date or dates of this action. (b) An owner of a general acute care hospital building that is classified as a nonconforming, Structural Performance Category-1 (SPC-1) building, who has requested an extension of the deadline described in subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 130060, shall submit a report to the office no later than June 30, 2009, describing the status of each building in complying with the requirements of Section 130060. The report shall identify, at a minimum, all of the following: (1) Each building that is subject to subdivision (a) of Section 130060. (2) The project number or numbers for retrofit or replacement of each building. (3) The projected construction start date or dates and projected construction completion date or dates. (4) The building or buildings to be removed from acute care service and the projected date or dates of that action. (c) An owner of a general acute care hospital building that is classified as a nonconforming, Structural Performance Category-1 (SPC-1) building, who has requested an extension of the deadline described in subdivision (a) or (b) of Section 130060, shall submit a report to the office no later than June 30, 2011, describing the status of each building in complying with the requirements of Section 130060. The report shall identify at least all of the following: (1) Each building that is subject to subdivision (a) of Section 130060. (2) The project number or numbers for retrofit or replacement of each building. (3) The projected construction start date or dates and projected construction completion date or dates. (4)  The   For the  building or buildings to be removed from acute care service  and the projected date or dates of that action.   , the following information   shall be included:   (A) The projected date or dates the building will be removed from service.   (B) The inpatient and outpatient services currently delivered in the building or buildings.   (C) The number of patient visits for each of the services listed in subparagraph (B) in the years 2008, 2009, and 2010.  (d) The office shall make the information required by subdivisions (a), (b), and (c) available on its Web site within 90 days of receipt of this information. (e) Hospitals that have not reported pursuant to this section are not eligible for the extension provided in subdivision (f) of Section 130060.