California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB309 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/27/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 309ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MAY 18, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Ducheny FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to amend Section 14302 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 309, Ducheny. Public resources: conservation corps. Existing law requires the California Conservation Corps to select young men and women for participation in the corps program on the basis of motivation for hard work, personal development, and public service, and without regard to their prior employment or educational background. This bill would require preference for inclusion in corps membership to be given to emancipated foster youth and at-risk youth. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) The California Conservation Corps provides critical emergency response work, including fighting fires and floods, that protects the health and safety of the state. (b) For over 30 years, the California Conservation Corps has conserved the state's natural resources through the use of California' s young men and women. This has been beneficial not only to the youth of the state by providing them with educational and work opportunities, but also to the state economy and its environment. (c) The California Conservation Corps provides a unique opportunity for those California youth who are not bound directly for college to follow a different path and gain needed training and experience in preparation for entrance into the workforce. SEC. 2. Section 14302 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 14302. (a) Young women and men shall be selected for participation in the corps program on the basis of motivation for hard work, personal development, and public service, and without regard to their prior employment or educational background. Participation shall be for a period of one year, which may be extended. (b) Preference for inclusion in corps membership shall be given to emancipated foster youth and at-risk youth. (c) The corps, in conjunction with the Employment Development Department, shall place an emphasis on developing and executing plans to assist corpsmembers in obtaining employment following their participation in the corps program.