California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB317 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/22/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 317AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 22, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Simitian FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Article 10.2.3 (commencing with Section 25214.8.25) to Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire alarm devices. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 317, as amended, Simitian. Fire Alarm Device Collection Act of 2009. Existing law generally regulates the disposal of hazardous waste  by the Department of Toxic Substances Control  . This bill would enact the Fire Alarm Device Collection Act of 2009.  The bill would require, on or before July 1, 2010, that the California Integrated Waste Management Board, in consultation with other state and federal agencies, prepare recommendations for the safe end-of-   life management of fire alarm devices.  The bill  also  would require that, on or before July 1, 2011, each manufacturer, as defined, of a fire alarm device, as defined, that is marketed, distributed, offered for sale, or sold in this state make information available to consumers that describes where and how to return, recycle, and dispose of the fire alarm device through the use of a toll-free telephone number or Internet Web site, labeled on the device and included in the packaging. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 10.2.3 (commencing with Section 25214.8.25) is added to Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: Article 10.2.3. Fire Alarm Device Collection Act of 2009 25214.8.25. This article shall be known, and may be cited, as the Fire Alarm Device Collection Act of 2009. 25214.8.26. For purposes of this article, the following definitions shall apply: (a) "Fire alarm device" means a device that has been approved and listed by the State Fire Marshal pursuant to Section 13114. (b) "Manufacturer" means a business concern that owns a name brand of fire alarm device marketed, distributed, offered for sale, or sold in this state. 25214.8.27.  (a) On or before July 1, 2011, each manufacturer   (a)     On or before July 1, 2010, the California Integrated Waste Management Board, in consultation with the State Department of Public Health, Department of Toxic Substances Control, and the United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission, shall prepare recommendations for the safe end-of-life management of fire alarm devices. The California Integrated Waste Management Board shall provide the recommendations to manufacturers of fire alarm devices that are marketed, distributed, offered for sale, or sold in   this state.   (b)     On or before July 1, 2011, each manufacturer  of a fire alarm device that is marketed, distributed, offered for sale, or sold in this state shall make information available to consumers that describes where and how to return, recycle, and dispose of the fire alarm device through the use of a toll-free telephone number or Internet Web site.  (b)   (c)  The information specified in subdivision  (a)   (b)  shall be labeled on the device and included in the packaging.