California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB367 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/15/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 367AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 2, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Negrete McLeod (Principal coauthor: Senator Harman)  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Feuer,   Fletcher,   and Tran   )  FEBRUARY 25, 2009 An act to add Section 51.13 to the Civil Code, relating to discrimination. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 367, as amended, Negrete McLeod. Discrimination. The Unruh Civil Rights Act provides that all persons within the jurisdiction of this state are free and equal, and no matter what their sex, race, color, religion, ancestry, national origin, disability, medical condition, marital status, or sexual orientation are entitled to the full and equal accommodations, advantages, facilities, privileges, or services in all business establishments of every kind whatsoever. This bill would provide that any discount or other benefit offered  to  or conferred on a  customer   consumer or prospective consumer  by a business because the  customer   consumer or prospective consumer  has suffered the loss or reduction of employment  or reduction of wages  would not be considered an arbitrary discrimination in violation of that act. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51.13 is added to the Civil Code, to read: 51.13. Any discount or other benefit offered  to  or conferred on a  customer   consumer or prospective consumer  by a business because the  customer   consumer or prospective consumer  has suffered the loss or reduction of employment or reduction of wages  shall not be considered an arbitrary discrimination in violation of Section 51.