California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB441 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/28/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 441AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Ducheny  (   Coauthor:   Senator   Hancock   )  FEBRUARY 26, 2009 An act to amend Sections 6024 and 6027 of  , and to add Sections 6027.1 and 6027.2 to,  the Penal Code, relating to corrections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 441, as amended, Ducheny. Corrections: Corrections Standards Authority. Existing law provides that there is established within the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation the Corrections Standards Authority. This bill would provide that, commencing July 1, 2010, the Corrections Standards Authority shall no longer be within the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Existing law provides that it is the duty of the Corrections Standards Authority to make a study of the entire subject of crime, as specified, and to report its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to the Governor and the Legislature at such times as they may require. This bill would make certain revisions in regards to what that study is to include.  This bill would also provide that it shall be the duty of the Corrections Standards Authority to study methods to improve coordination and effectiveness between state parole and local law enforcement, and to report its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to the Governor and the Legislature on or before July 1, 2010.   This bill would require the Corrections Standards Authority, in consultation with the Legislative Analyst's Office, contingent upon funding, to conduct an evaluation and report regarding the effect of concurrent parole and probation sentences on state and local governments and the levels of coordination between the state and counties in these cases and to include recommendations on how to effectively reduce the numbers of individuals sentenced to concurrent parole and probation and the effect on state and local public safety resources.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6024 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 6024. Commencing July 1, 2005, there is hereby established within the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation the Corrections Standards Authority. As of July 1, 2005, any reference to the Board of Corrections refers to the Corrections Standards Authority. As of that date, the Board of Corrections is abolished. Commencing July 1, 2010, the Corrections Standards Authority shall no longer be within the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. SEC. 2. Section 6027 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 6027. It shall be the duty of the Corrections Standards Authority to make a study of the entire subject of crime, with particular reference to conditions in the State of California, including causes of crime, best practices in the field of crime prevention, detection of crime and apprehension of criminals, methods of prosecution of persons accused of crime, and the entire subject of penology, including standards and training for correctional personnel, and to report its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to the Governor and the Legislature at such times as they may require.  SEC. 3.   Section 6027.1 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 6027.1. It shall be the duty of the Corrections Standards Authority to study methods to improve coordination and effectiveness between state parole and local law enforcement, and to report its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to the Governor and the Legislature on or before July 1, 2010.   SEC. 4.   Section 6027.2 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 6027.2. The Corrections Standards Authority shall, in consultation with the Legislative Analyst's Office, contingent upon funding, conduct an evaluation and report regarding the effect of concurrent parole and probation sentences on state and local governments and the levels of coordination between the state and counties in these cases. This report shall include recommendations on how to effectively reduce the numbers of individuals sentenced to concurrent parole and probation and the effect on state and local public safety resources.