BILL NUMBER: SB 5AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 13, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 16, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Maldonado DECEMBER 1, 2008 An act relating to peace officers , and making an appropriation therefor . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 5, as amended, Maldonado. Peace officers: certified bomb technicians. Existing law establishes which persons are included in the definition of peace officers. Existing law requires that persons desiring peace officer status who were not entitled to be designated as peace officers, as specified, shall request the Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training to undertake a feasibility study regarding designating or those persons as peace officers. This bill would require the commission, upon receiving a request, appropriate $30,000 from the General Fund to the commission to conduct a feasibility study regarding designating as peace officers members of a fire department bomb squad unit who are certified , by December 31, 2009, by the Federal Bureau of Investigation as certified bomb technicians. The bill would specify that the commission may seek reimbursement for the reasonable cost of the study from the requesting person or entity. Vote: 2/3 majority . Appropriation: yes no . Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Upon receiving a request in accordance with Section 13540 of the Penal Code, the Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training shall conduct a feasibility study regarding designating as peace officers, under Section 830.37 of the Penal Code, members of a fire department bomb squad unit who are certified, as of December 31, 2009, by the Federal Bureau of Investigation as certified bomb technicians. The commission may seek reimbursement for the reasonable cost of the study from the requesting person or entity, as provided in Section 13540 of the Penal Code. SECTION 1. The sum of thirty thousand dollars ($30,000) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training to conduct, in accordance with Section 13540 of the Penal Code, a feasibility study regarding designating as peace officers, under Section 830.37 of the Penal Code, members of a fire department bomb squad unit who are certified, as of December 31, 2009, by the Federal Bureau of Investigation as certified bomb technicians.