California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB524 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/11/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 524ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE OCTOBER 8, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY OCTOBER 8, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY OCTOBER 8, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 7, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 29, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 31, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Cogdill (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Gilmore) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 524, Cogdill. Transportation funds. Existing law, pursuant to Article XIX B of the California Constitution, requires a specified portion of the sales tax on gasoline to be transferred from the General Fund to the Transportation Investment Fund for allocation to the state transportation improvement program, city and county streets and roads, and the Public Transportation Account. In order for a city or a county to receive a streets and roads allocation from the Transportation Investment Fund, it is required to annually expend from its general fund for street, road, and highway purposes an amount not less than the annual average of its expenditures from its general fund for those purposes during the 1996-97, 1997-98, and 1998-99 fiscal years. Existing law provides that if a city or county fails to comply with this maintenance of effort requirement in a particular fiscal year, it may alternatively comply by expending in that year and the following fiscal year a combined total amount that is not less than the amount otherwise required to be expended in the 2 fiscal years. This bill would, notwithstanding those provisions, provide that the County of Fresno would have until June 30, 2015, to meet the maintenance of effort requirement applicable to counties in order to receive a streets and roads allocation from the Transportation Investment Fund for the 2009-10 fiscal year. This bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the County of Fresno. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Notwithstanding subdivision (f) of Section 7104.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, the County of Fresno shall have until June 30, 2015, to meet the maintenance of effort requirement applicable to counties in order to receive a streets and roads allocation from the Transportation Investment Fund for the 2009-10 fiscal year. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution because of the California Constitution because of the unique transportation funding needs in the County of Fresno. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to implement the Budget Act of 2010 as quickly as possible, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.