California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB557 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/08/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 557AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 8, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 5, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 22, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Ma   )  FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 236.3 to the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 557, as amended, Yee. Human trafficking: property:  seizure.   nuisance.  Existing law defines human trafficking as the deprivation or violation of the personal liberty of another person with the intent to commit certain specified sex offenses with the person or to obtain forced labor or services, as specified. This bill would  authorize   provide that upon conviction for the offense of human trafficking involving  real property  which is  used to facilitate the commission of  that   an  offense  involving illegal gambling, lewdness, assignation, or prostitution, that real property is authorized  to be declared and treated as a nuisance, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 236.3 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 236.3. Upon conviction of a violation of Section 236.1, when real property is used to facilitate the commission of the offense  and the offense involves illegal gambling, lewdness, assignation, or prostitution  , the procedures for determining whether the property constitutes a nuisance and the remedies imposed therefor as provided in Article 2 (commencing with Section 11225) of Chapter 3 of Title 1 of Part 4 shall apply.