BILL NUMBER: SB 564AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 20, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 5, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hollingsworth FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 6610 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to sexually violent predators. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 564, as amended, Hollingsworth. Sexually violent predators. Existing law provides for the civil commitment of criminal offenders who have been determined to be sexually violent predators for treatment in a secure state hospital facility, as specified. Existing law also sets forth provisions governing the release of sexually violent predators from state custody. This bill would require sexually violent predators who are released into a forensic conditional release program after January 1, 2010, to be placed in a reentry facility administered by the State Department of Mental Health until suitable housing is found, but wouldthe bill would, however, preclude failure to beplaceplaced in a reentry facility from being grounds for preventing conditional release. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature hereby finds and declares the following: (a) The High Risk Sex Offender and Sexually Violent Predator Task Force, in their December 2006 report, stated that, "[h]omeless releases cause an unacceptable and unnecessary risk to the public because the individual cannot be properly supervised and many of the terms and conditions of release cannot be enforced (such as global positioning satellite monitoring, curfews, and associations with other felons). The Task Force believes that the release ofany SVPa sexually violent predator without a home into the community creates an unacceptably high risk to the public and theSVPsexually violent predator . (b) Therefore, it is the intent of the Legislature to provide appropriate reentry housing forSVPssexually violent predators until suitable residential housing may be found. SEC. 2. Section 6610 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 6610. Notwithstanding any other law,anya sexually violent predator who is released into a forensic conditional release program after January 1, 2010, pursuant to this article shall be placed in a reentry facility administered by the State Department of Mental Health , which may include either a new or existing facility, until suitable housing is found for the sexually violent predator. The failure of the department to place a person in a reentry facility shall not be grounds to prevent conditional release of the person who has demonstrated that he or she would not be a danger to others while under supervision and treatment in the community.