BILL NUMBER: SB 575INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Steinberg FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to amend Section 65588 of the Government Code, relating to local planning. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 575, as introduced, Steinberg. Local planning: housing element. Existing law requires every city, county, and city and county to revise the housing element of its general plan as frequently as is appropriate to reflect the results of the periodic review. Existing law further requires that all local governments within the regional jurisdiction of the San Diego Association of Governments adopt their 5th revision no more than 5 years from the 4th revision. This bill instead would require that all local governments within the regional jurisdiction of the San Diego Association of Governments adopt their 5th revision no later than an unspecified period of time. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 65588 of the Government Code is amended to read: 65588. (a) Each local government shall review its housing element as frequently as appropriate to evaluate all of the following: (1) The appropriateness of the housing goals, objectives, and policies in contributing to the attainment of the state housing goal. (2) The effectiveness of the housing element in attainment of the community's housing goals and objectives. (3) The progress of the city, county, or city and county in implementation of the housing element. (b) Except as provided in paragraph (7) of subdivision (e), the housing element shall be revised as appropriate, but not less than every eight years, to reflect the results of this periodic review, by those local governments that are located within a region covered by (1) a metropolitan planning organization in a region classified as nonattainment for one or more pollutants regulated by the federal Clean Air Act or (2) a metropolitan planning organization or regional transportation planning agency that is required, or has elected pursuant to subparagraph (L) of paragraph (2) of subdivision (b) of Section 65080, to adopt a regional transportation plan not less than every four years, except that a local government that does not adopt a housing element within 120 days of the statutory deadline for adoption of the housing element shall revise its housing element as appropriate, but not less than every four years. The housing element shall be revised, as appropriate, but not less than every five years by those local governments that are located within a region covered by a metropolitan planning organization or regional transportation planning agency that is required to adopt a regional transportation plan not less than every five years, to reflect the results of this periodic review. Nothing in this section shall be construed to excuse the obligations of the local government to adopt a revised housing element no later than the date specified in this section. (c) The review and revision of housing elements required by this section shall take into account any low- or moderate-income housing provided or required pursuant to Section 65590. (d) The review pursuant to subdivision (c) shall include, but need not be limited to, the following: (1) The number of new housing units approved for construction within the coastal zone after January 1, 1982. (2) The number of housing units for persons and families of low or moderate income, as defined in Section 50093 of the Health and Safety Code, required to be provided in new housing developments either within the coastal zone or within three miles of the coastal zone pursuant to Section 65590. (3) The number of existing residential dwelling units occupied by persons and families of low or moderate income, as defined in Section 50093 of the Health and Safety Code, that have been authorized to be demolished or converted since January 1, 1982, in the coastal zone. (4) The number of residential dwelling units for persons and families of low or moderate income, as defined in Section 50093 of the Health and Safety Code, that have been required for replacement or authorized to be converted or demolished as identified in paragraph (3). The location of the replacement units, either onsite, elsewhere within the locality's jurisdiction within the coastal zone, or within three miles of the coastal zone within the locality's jurisdiction, shall be designated in the review. (e) Notwithstanding subdivision (b) or the date of adoption of the housing elements previously in existence, each city, county, and city and county shall revise its housing element according to the following schedule: (1) Local governments within the regional jurisdiction of the Southern California Association of Governments: June 30, 2006, for the fourth revision. (2) Local governments within the regional jurisdiction of the Association of Bay Area Governments: June 30, 2007, for the fourth revision. (3) Local governments within the regional jurisdiction of the Council of Fresno County Governments, the Kern County Council of Governments, and the Sacramento Area Council of Governments: June 30, 2002, for the third revision, and June 30, 2008, for the fourth revision. (4) Local governments within the regional jurisdiction of the Association of Monterey Bay Area Governments: December 31, 2002, for the third revision, and June 30, 2009, for the fourth revision. (5) Local governments within the regional jurisdiction of the San Diego Association of Governments: June 30, 2005, for the fourth revision. (6) All other local governments: December 31, 2003, for the third revision, and June 30, 2009, for the fourth revision. (7) (A) All local governments within a metropolitan planning organization in a region classified as nonattainment for one or more pollutants regulated by the federal Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. Sec. 7506), except those within the regional jurisdiction of the San Diego Association of Governments, shall adopt the fifth revision of the housing element no later than 18 months after adoption of the first regional transportation plan to be adopted after September 30, 2010. (B) All local governments within the regional jurisdiction of the San Diego Association of Governments shall adopt their fifth revision nomore than five years from the fourth revisionlater than ____ and their sixth revision no later than 18 months after adoption of the first regional transportation plan to be adopted after the fifth revision due date. (C) All local governments within the regional jurisdiction of a metropolitan planning organization or a regional transportation planning agency that has made an election pursuant to subparagraph (L) of paragraph (2) of subdivision (b) of Section 65080 shall be subject to the eight-year planning period pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 65588 and shall adopt its next housing element 18 months after adoption of the first regional transportation plan following the election. (f) For purposes of this article, "planning period" shall be the time period for periodic revision of the housing element pursuant to this section.